AK HB16 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - REFERRED TO RESOURCES
Pending: Senate Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Shared Animal And Raw Milk/products

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Shared Animal And Raw Milk/products

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateREFERRED TO RESOURCES
2019-05-06SenateRES, FIN
2019-05-06SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-05-03HouseVERSION: SSHB 16
2019-05-03HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2019-05-03HouseCOSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER, JOSEPHSON, STUTES, TUCK
2019-05-03HousePASSED Y38 E2
2019-05-03HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME SSHB 16
2019-05-03HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-05-03HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-05-03HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/2019
2019-04-26HouseFN3: ZERO(H.FIN/DHS)
2019-04-26HouseFN1: ZERO(DEC)
2019-04-26HouseFOSTER
2019-04-26HouseDP: JOHNSTON, CARPENTER, TILTON, LEBON, MERRICK, JOSEPHSON, ORTIZ, WILSON,
2019-04-26HouseFIN RPT 9DP
2019-04-24HouseCOSPONSOR(S): WILSON
2019-04-01HouseFN2: INDETERMINATE(DHS)
2019-04-01HouseFN1: ZERO(DEC)
2019-04-01HouseDP: TUCK, HANNAN, TALERICO, RAUSCHER, TARR
2019-04-01HouseRES RPT 5DP
2019-03-20HouseRES, FIN
2019-03-20HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-03-20HouseSPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
2019-02-20HouseRES, FIN
2019-02-20HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-02-20HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/7/19

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback