AK HB16 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to training regarding disabilities for police officers, probation officers, parole officers, correctional officers, and village public safety officers; relating to rights and responsibilities for drivers when encountering or being stopped by a peace officer; relating to a voluntary disability designation on a state identification card and a driver's license; relating to the implementation of the federal REAL ID Act of 2005; relating to issuance of identification cards and drivers' licenses; relating to data sharing by the Department of Administration; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driv. License Req;disability:id &training

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - House - House: Effective Date Concur (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - House: Concur (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Effective Date Clauses (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 7 (Y: 4 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 6 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 7 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 7 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 6 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 7 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Adopt Rules Senate Committee Substitute (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
2017-05-22HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 5/19 CHAPTER 8 SLA 17
2017-05-22HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2017-05-22House1:15 PM 5/19/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2017-05-17HouseDRUMMOND, TARR, FANSLER, STUTES, CHENAULT, FOSTER, SADDLER, GUTTENBERG
2017-05-17HouseCOSPONSOR(S) REMOVED: LEDOUX, GRENN, JOSEPHSON, KAWASAKI, GARA, PARISH,
2017-05-17HouseTITLE CHANGE: SCR 8
2017-05-17HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y31 N6 E3
2017-05-17HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y25 N12 E3
2017-05-17HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
2017-05-16HouseKNOPP, WILSON, TUCK
2017-05-16HouseCOSPONSOR(S) REMOVED: TILTON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, RAUSCHER, JOHNSON, MILLETT,
2017-05-16HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2017-05-15SenateVERSION: SCS HB 16(RLS) AM S
2017-05-15SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2017-05-15SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S) REMOVED: MICCICHE
2017-05-15SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y14 N5 E1
2017-05-15SenatePASSED Y14 N5 E1
2017-05-15SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S) REMOVED: COSTELLO
2017-05-15SenateAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2017-05-15SenateAM NO 3 ADOPTED UC
2017-05-15SenateTAKE AM 3 FROM TABLE UC
2017-05-15SenateAM NO 7 FAILED Y4 N15 E1
2017-05-15SenateAM NO 6 FAILED Y6 N13 E1
2017-05-15SenateAM NO 5 FAILED Y7 N12 E1
2017-05-15SenateAM NO 4 FAILED Y7 N12 E1
2017-05-15SenateAM NO 3 TABLED UC
2017-05-15SenateAM NO 2 FAILED Y6 N13 E1
2017-05-15SenateAM NO 1 FAILED Y7 N12 E1
2017-05-15SenateRETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMENDMENTS UC
2017-05-15SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 16(RLS)
2017-05-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/15 CALENDAR
2017-05-13SenateRLS SCS ADOPTED Y13 N5 E2
2017-05-13SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-05-13SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2017
2017-05-13SenateFN7: (S.RLS/ADM)
2017-05-13SenateFN6: ZERO(S.RLS/DPS)
2017-05-13SenateFN5: ZERO(S.RLS/MVA)
2017-05-13SenateFN4: ZERO(COR)
2017-05-13SenateFN3: ZERO(DPS)
2017-05-13SenateNR: MICCICHE
2017-05-13SenateDP: MEYER, MACKINNON, GARDNER, KELLY
2017-05-13SenateTITLE CHANGE: SCR 8
2017-05-13SenateRLS RPT SCS 4DP 1NR NEW TITLE
2017-04-10SenateFN4: ZERO(COR)
2017-04-10SenateFN3: ZERO(DPS)
2017-04-10SenateFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2017-04-10SenateNR: DUNLEAVY
2017-04-10SenateDP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, OLSON, MICCICHE
2017-04-10SenateTITLE CHANGE: SCR 8
2017-04-10SenateFIN RPT SCS 6DP 1NR NEW TITLE
2017-03-27SenateFN4: ZERO(COR)
2017-03-27SenateFN3: ZERO(DPS)
2017-03-27SenateFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2017-03-27SenateDNP: WILSON
2017-03-27SenateDP: EGAN, COGHILL, GIESSEL
2017-03-27SenateNR: DUNLEAVY
2017-03-27SenateTITLE CHANGE: SCR 8
2017-03-27SenateSTA RPT SCS 3DP 1DNP 1NR NEW TITLE
2017-03-08SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, MICCICHE, COSTELLO
2017-02-10SenateSTA, FIN
2017-02-10SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-02-08HouseVERSION: HB 16
2017-02-08HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-02-08HouseCOSPONSOR(S): BIRCH, DRUMMOND, PARISH
2017-02-08HousePASSED Y38 E2
2017-02-08HouseAM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
2017-02-08HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC
2017-02-08HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 16
2017-02-06HouseCOSPONSOR(S): FANSLER, TILTON, JOSEPHSON, KITO, SPOHNHOLZ, KOPP
2017-02-06HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/8 CALENDAR
2017-02-06HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-02-06HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 2/6/2017
2017-02-01HouseFIN REFERRAL WAIVED
2017-01-30HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KNOPP
2017-01-27HouseCOSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ, RAUSCHER, KAWASAKI, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, CHENAULT
2017-01-27HouseFN3: ZERO(DPS)
2017-01-27HouseFN2: ZERO(COR)
2017-01-27HouseFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2017-01-27HouseDP: JOHNSON, WOOL, LEDOUX, KNOPP, BIRCH, TUCK, KREISS-TOMKINS
2017-01-27HouseSTA RPT 7DP
2017-01-25HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, GRENN, TUCK
2017-01-20HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, STUTES, FOSTER, WILSON, JOHNSON, CLAMAN, GUTTENBERG
2017-01-18HouseSTA, FIN
2017-01-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-01-18HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/30?Root=HB16
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0016A.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0016B.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0016C.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0016D.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0016E.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0016Z.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB16&jrn=0214&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB16&jrn=1201&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB16&jrn=1211&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB16&jrn=1213&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB16&jrn=1214&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB16&jrn=1215&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB16&jrn=1216&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB16&jrn=1217&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB16&jrn=1218&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB16&jrn=1219&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB16&jrn=1492&hse=H

Bill Comments

feedback