AK HB158 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to contributions from permanent fund dividends to the general fund.
Title
Pfd Contributions To General Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2022-03-16 | House | FN1: (REV) |
2022-03-16 | House | NR: ORTIZ, EDGMON, LEBON, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, MERRICK |
2022-03-16 | House | DP: CARPENTER, THOMPSON, JOHNSON, RASMUSSEN, FOSTER |
2022-03-16 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NEW TITLE 5DP 6NR |
2022-02-16 | House | FN1: (REV) |
2022-02-16 | House | AM: VANCE, EASTMAN |
2022-02-16 | House | NR: STORY, KREISS-TOMKINS |
2022-02-16 | House | DNP: CLAMAN |
2022-02-16 | House | DP: TARR, KAUFMAN |
2022-02-16 | House | STA RPT 2DP 1DNP 2NR 2AM |
2021-05-12 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER |
2021-04-30 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE, VANCE |
2021-04-28 | House | JOHNSON, NELSON, LEBON |
2021-04-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): CRONK, MCCARTY, TARR, MCKAY, CARPENTER, SHAW, SPOHNHOLZ, THOMPSON, |
2021-04-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TILTON, HOPKINS, GILLHAM, KURKA, MCCABE, KAUFMAN, TUCK, RASMUSSEN |
2021-04-16 | House | COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER |
2021-03-31 | House | STA, FIN |
2021-03-31 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/32?Root=HB158 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0158A.PDF |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0158B.PDF |