AK HB156 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-28 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/26/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to a parent's right to direct the education of a child; relating to the duties of the state Board of Education and Early Development, the Department of Education and Early Development, school boards, and school districts; relating to public school curriculum and assessments; relating to compliance with federal education laws; relating to public school accountability; relating to a statewide assessment plan and review of education laws and regulations; repealing the minimum expenditure for instruction for school districts; relating to sex education, human reproduction education, and human sexuality education; relating to suicide awareness and prevention training; relating to contracts for student assessments; relating to questionnaires and surveys administered in public schools; relating to physical examinations for teachers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Accountability Measures; Fed. Law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-05 - House - House: Adopt (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House: Adopt (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Adopt the Conference Committee Report? Effective Dates (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: Adopt (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - House - House: Concur (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - House - House: Concur (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - House - House: Concur (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-28HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/26/16
2016-07-28HouseLAW W/O GOV SIGNATURE 7/28 CHAPTER 54 SLA 16
2016-07-11HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2016-07-11House3:53 PM 7/5/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2016-05-05HouseENGROSSED
2016-05-05HouseVERSION: SCS CSHB 156(FIN)(EFD FLD H)
2016-05-05House...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2016-05-05HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y23 N16 E1
2016-05-05HouseCC RPT ADPTD Y21 N18 E1 SCS CSHB 156(FIN)
2016-05-05HouseRESCIND ACTION FAIL ADP CC REPORT UC
2016-05-04SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2016-05-04SenateCC RPT ADPTD Y14 N4 E2 SCS CSHB 156(FIN)
2016-05-04SenateCC REPORT READ AND TAKEN UP
2016-05-04HouseCC REPORT FAILED Y20 N19 E1 SCS CSHB 156(FIN)(FLD H)
2016-05-04HouseCONSIDER CC REPORT
2016-05-03HouseHELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
2016-05-03HouseFN2: ZERO(EED)
2016-05-03HouseTITLE CHANGE: SCR 25
2016-05-03HouseCC REPORT: SCS CSHB 156(FIN) (RECEIVED 8:45 AM ON 5/3)
2016-04-29SenateDUNLEAVY (CHAIR), GIESSEL, OLSON
2016-04-29SenateCONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
2016-04-29SenateFAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y- N13 E6 A1
2016-04-29SenateRECEDE MESSAGE TAKEN UP
2016-04-22SenateRECEDE MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2016-04-17HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GATTIS
2016-04-17HouseCOSPONSOR REMOVED: COLVER
2016-04-17HouseFAILED CONCUR (S) AM Y20 N19 E1
2016-04-17HouseRESCIND ACTION FAIL CONCUR UC
2016-04-17HouseKELLER(CHAIR), TALERICO, KREISS-TOMKINS
2016-04-17HouseCONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
2016-04-17HouseFAILED CONCUR (S) AM Y20 N19 E1
2016-04-17HouseHELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
2016-04-17SenateVERSION: SCS CSHB 156(FIN)
2016-04-17SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2016-04-17SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): DUNLEAVY, MICCICHE
2016-04-17SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2016-04-17SenatePASSED Y15 N5
2016-04-17SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 156(FIN)
2016-04-17SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2016-04-17SenateFIN SCS ADOPTED UC
2016-04-17SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2016-04-17SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2016
2016-04-16SenateFN2: ZERO(EED)
2016-04-16SenateAM: MACKINNON
2016-04-16SenateNR: BISHOP, HOFFMAN, OLSON
2016-04-16SenateDP: KELLY, MICCICHE, DUNLEAVY
2016-04-16SenateFIN RPT SCS 3DP 3NR 1AM NEW TITLE
2016-04-14SenateFN1: INDETERMINATE(EED)
2016-04-14SenateDNP: GARDNER
2016-04-14SenateDP: DUNLEAVY, GIESSEL, HUGGINS
2016-04-14SenateTITLE CHANGE: SCR 25
2016-04-14SenateEDC RPT SCS 3DP 1DNP NEW TITLE
2016-04-11SenateEDC, FIN
2016-04-11SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2016-04-10HouseVERSION: CSHB 156(EDC) AM
2016-04-10HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2016-04-10HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y28 N11 E1
2016-04-10HousePASSED Y22 N17 E1
2016-04-10House...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2016-04-10HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
2016-04-10HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC
2016-04-10HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 156(EDC)
2016-04-09HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/10 CALENDAR
2016-04-09HouseEDC CS ADOPTED UC
2016-04-09HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2016-04-09HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2016
2016-04-05HouseCOSPONSOR(S): COLVER, WILSON
2016-04-05HouseFN1: INDETERMINATE(EED)
2016-04-05HouseAM: GUTTENBERG
2016-04-05HouseNR: SADDLER, PRUITT, EDGMON, MUNOZ
2016-04-05HouseDNP: KAWASAKI
2016-04-05HouseDP: WILSON, GATTIS, THOMPSON
2016-04-05HouseFIN RPT CS(EDC) NT 3DP 1DNP 4NR 1AM
2016-03-29HouseCOSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD
2016-03-25HouseFIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER EDC
2016-03-24HouseFN1: INDETERMINATE(EED)
2016-03-24HouseNR: DRUMMOND, SEATON
2016-03-24HouseDP: KELLER, TALERICO, COLVER, SPOHNHOLZ, VAZQUEZ
2016-03-24HouseEDC RPT CS(EDC) NT 5DP 2NR
2015-03-20HouseEDC
2015-03-20HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_bill.asp?session=29&bill=HB156
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/29/Bills/HB0156A.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/29/Bills/HB0156B.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/29/Bills/HB0156C.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/29/Bills/HB0156D.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/29/Bills/HB0156E.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/29/Bills/HB0156F.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/29/Bills/HB0156Z.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=29&bill=HB156&jrn=2191&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=29&bill=HB156&jrn=2192&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=29&bill=HB156&jrn=2599&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=29&bill=HB156&jrn=2507&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=29&bill=HB156&jrn=2521&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=29&bill=HB156&jrn=2506&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=29&bill=HB156&jrn=2741&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=29&bill=HB156&jrn=2750&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=29&bill=HB156&jrn=2773&hse=H

Bill Comments

feedback