AK HB155 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to court-appointed visitors and experts; relating to the powers and duties of the office of public advocacy; relating to the powers and duties of the Alaska Court System; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Court System Provide Visitors & Experts
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Tuck [D] | Sen. Matt Claman [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - House - House: Concur (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Concur (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Concur (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/22 |
2022-06-30 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 21 SLA 22 |
2022-06-27 | House | 11:10 A.M. 6/27/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-17 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-17 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 N2 E1 |
2022-05-17 | House | CONCUR TAKEN UP UC |
2022-05-17 | House | CONCUR READ AND HELD |
2022-05-16 | Senate | VERSION: SCS HB 155(JUD) |
2022-05-16 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2022-05-15 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-15 | Senate | PASSED Y15 N- E2 A3 |
2022-05-15 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 155(JUD) |
2022-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2022-05-15 | Senate | JUD SCS ADOPTED UC |
2022-05-15 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-15 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/2022 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | FN4: (AJS) |
2022-05-12 | Senate | FN3: (ADM) |
2022-05-12 | Senate | NR: WILSON |
2022-05-12 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, HOFFMAN, OLSON, VON IMHOF |
2022-05-12 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS(JUD) 4DP 1NR SAME TITLE |
2022-02-11 | Senate | FN4: (AJS) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | FN3: (ADM) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | DP: HOLLAND, HUGHES, KIEHL |
2022-02-11 | Senate | JUD RPT SCS(JUD) 3DP SAME TITLE |
2021-05-14 | Senate | JUD, FIN |
2021-05-14 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-05-13 | House | VERSION: HB 155 |
2021-05-13 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2021-05-13 | House | COSPONSOR(S): CLAMAN |
2021-05-13 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y40 |
2021-05-13 | House | PASSED Y38 N2 |
2021-05-13 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 155 |
2021-05-13 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-13 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-13 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2021 |
2021-05-07 | House | FN2: (AJS) |
2021-05-07 | House | FN1: (ADM) |
2021-05-07 | House | NR: CARPENTER, RASMUSSEN |
2021-05-07 | House | DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, LEBON, THOMPSON, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, MERRICK |
2021-05-07 | House | FIN RPT 7DP 2NR |
2021-04-09 | House | FN2: (AJS) |
2021-04-09 | House | FN1: (ADM) |
2021-04-09 | House | NR: EASTMAN, VANCE, KURKA |
2021-04-09 | House | DP: KREISS-TOMKINS, DRUMMOND, SNYDER, CLAMAN |
2021-04-09 | House | JUD RPT 4DP 3NR |
2021-03-29 | House | JUD, FIN |
2021-03-29 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Civil Procedure
Courts
Disabilities
Estates
Families
Fees
Guardianship
Health & Social Services
Hearings
Injunctions
Medical Care
Mental Health
Rights
Trusts
Courts
Disabilities
Estates
Families
Fees
Guardianship
Health & Social Services
Hearings
Injunctions
Medical Care
Mental Health
Rights
Trusts