AK HB152 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the organized militia; and relating to the authority of the adjutant general.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Organized Militia; Ak St. Defense Force

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Rescind previous action (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Rescind previous action (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16SenateREFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
2018-03-16SenateSTA, JUD
2018-03-16SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-03-15HouseVERSION: CSHB 152(STA)
2018-03-15HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-03-15HousePASSED Y23 N14 E3
2018-03-15HouseRET 3RD/RESCIND ACTION (FLD) PASSAGE Y28 N9 E3
2018-03-07HouseENGROSSED
2018-03-07HouseRECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY MOTION WITHDRAWN
2018-03-07HouseEASTMAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION MOTION WITHDRAWN
2018-03-07HouseFAILED PASSAGE Y20 N18 E1 V1
2018-03-07HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 152(STA)
2018-03-07HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-03-07HouseSTA CS ADOPTED UC
2018-03-07HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-03-07HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/7/2018
2018-02-23HouseFN2: ZERO(MVA)
2018-02-23HouseNR: BIRCH, WOOL, LEDOUX
2018-02-23HouseDNP: KNOPP
2018-02-23HouseDP: TUCK, KREISS-TOMKINS
2018-02-23HouseSTA RPT CS(STA) 2DP 1DNP 3NR
2017-04-05HouseFN1: ZERO(MVA)
2017-04-05HouseNR: LEDOUX
2017-04-05HouseDNP: REINBOLD, SADDLER
2017-04-05HouseDP: SPOHNHOLZ, PARISH, TUCK
2017-04-05HouseMLV RPT CS(MLV) 3DP 2DNP 1NR
2017-03-06HouseMLV, STA
2017-03-06HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback