AK HB151 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to a special audit; relating to the duties of the Department of Health and Social Services; relating to training and workload standards for employees of the Department of Health and Social Services and providing immunity from damages related to those standards; relating to foster care home licensing; relating to civil and criminal history background checks for foster care licensing and payments; relating to placement of a child in need of aid; relating to the rights and responsibilities of foster parents; relating to completed investigations of reports of harm to a child; requiring the Department of Health and Social Services to provide information to a child or person released from the department's custody; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dhss;cina; Foster Care; Child Protection

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - House - House: Concur (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-11HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
2018-06-11HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 6/7 CHAPTER 15 SLA 18
2018-06-06HouseFN12: (DHS)
2018-06-06HouseFN11: (DHS)
2018-06-06HouseFN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 286
2018-06-06HouseLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18
2018-06-06House2:08 PM 6/6/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2018-05-21HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2018-05-10HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, KAWASAKI, JOSEPHSON, LEDOUX, KOPP
2018-05-10HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-10HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 N1 E1 A1
2018-05-10HouseTITLE CHANGE: SCR 21
2018-05-10HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
2018-05-10HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2018-05-09SenateVERSION: SCS CSHB 151(FIN)
2018-05-09SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2018-05-09SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-09SenatePASSED Y18 N- E2
2018-05-09SenateMEYER, VON IMHOF
2018-05-09SenateCOSTELLO, HOFFMAN, GARDNER, HUGHES, EGAN, OLSON, WIELECHOWSKI, WILSON, COGHILL
2018-05-09SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): KELLY, GIESSEL, MACKINNON, MICCICHE, STEDMAN, STEVENS, BISHOP
2018-05-09SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 151(FIN)
2018-05-09SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-05-09SenateFIN SCS ADOPTED UC
2018-05-09SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-09SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/2018
2018-05-02SenateFISCAL INFORMATION FORTHCOMING
2018-05-02SenateFN12: (DHS)
2018-05-02SenateFN11: (DHS)
2018-05-02SenateNR: MICCICHE
2018-05-02SenateDP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, OLSON
2018-05-02SenateFIN RPT SCS 6DP 1NR NEW TITLE
2018-04-06SenateFISCAL INFORMATION FORTHCOMING
2018-04-06SenateFN12: (DHS)
2018-04-06SenateFN11: (DHS)
2018-04-06SenateNR: VON IMHOF
2018-04-06SenateDP: BEGICH, GIESSEL
2018-04-06SenateAM: WILSON
2018-04-06SenateTITLE CHANGE: SCR 21
2018-04-06SenateHSS RPT SCS 2DP 1NR 1AM NEW TITLE
2018-01-18SenateHSS, FIN
2018-01-18SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-05-17HouseVERSION: CSHB 151(FIN)
2017-05-17HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-05-17HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y38 N1 A1
2017-05-17HousePASSED Y23 N17
2017-05-17HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 151(FIN)
2017-05-16HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/17 CALENDAR
2017-05-16HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2017-05-16HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-05-16HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/2017
2017-05-16HouseFN10: (DHS)
2017-05-16HouseFN9: (DHS)
2017-05-16HouseFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2017-05-16HouseAM: TILTON, THOMPSON, KAWASAKI, WILSON
2017-05-16HouseNR: GUTTENBERG
2017-05-16HouseDP: ORTIZ, GARA, SEATON, FOSTER
2017-05-16HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 4DP 1NR 4AM
2017-04-16HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ, DRUMMOND, PARISH, FANSLER, TUCK, GRENN, ORTIZ
2017-03-24HouseFN8: (DHS)
2017-03-24HouseFN7: (DHS)
2017-03-24HouseFN6: (DHS)
2017-03-24HouseFN5: (DHS)
2017-03-24HouseFN4: (DHS)
2017-03-24HouseFN3: (DHS)
2017-03-24HouseFN2: INDETERMINATE(DHS)
2017-03-24HouseFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2017-03-24HouseAM: JOHNSTON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD
2017-03-24HouseNR: KITO
2017-03-24HouseDNP: EASTMAN
2017-03-24HouseDP: TARR, EDGMON, SPOHNHOLZ
2017-03-24HouseHSS RPT CS(HSS) NT 3DP 1DNP 1NR 2AM
2017-03-01HouseHSS, FIN
2017-03-01HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback