AK HB150 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on May 12 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 9/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to pay, allowances, and benefits for members of the organized militia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pay, Allowances, Benefits For Militia Mem

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2018-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-09HouseDUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 9/1/18
2018-08-09House8:30 AM 8/9/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2018-05-12SenateVERSION: HB 150
2018-05-12SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-05-12SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2018-05-12SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 150
2018-05-12SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-05-12SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-12SenateRULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 5/12/18
2018-05-02SenateFN2: INDETERMINATE(MVA)
2018-05-02SenateNR: OLSON
2018-05-02SenateDP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE
2018-05-02SenateFIN RPT 6DP 1NR
2018-03-19SenateFN2: INDETERMINATE(MVA)
2018-03-19SenateDP: MEYER, WILSON, COGHILL, EGAN
2018-03-19SenateSTA RPT 4DP
2018-01-18SenateSTA, FIN
2018-01-18SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-05-17HouseVERSION: HB 150
2017-05-17HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-05-17HouseRECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
2017-05-16HouseMILLETT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2017-05-16HousePASSED Y38 E1 A1
2017-05-16HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 150
2017-05-15HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/16 CALENDAR
2017-05-15HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-05-15HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/2017
2017-05-10HouseFN1: INDETERMINATE(MVA)
2017-05-10HouseSEATON, FOSTER
2017-05-10HouseDP: WILSON, KAWASAKI, TILTON, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GRENN, PRUITT, STUTES, GARA,
2017-05-10HouseFIN RPT 11DP
2017-03-10HouseFN1: INDETERMINATE(MVA)
2017-03-10HouseNR: RAUSCHER
2017-03-10HouseDP: LEDOUX, PARISH, SADDLER, TUCK
2017-03-10HouseMLV RPT 4DP 1NR
2017-03-01HouseMLV, FIN
2017-03-01HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback