AK HB149 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to allowing certain child day care providers to organize for the purpose of collective bargaining; and establishing the child day care provider fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Care Provider Collective Bargaining

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 10 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2022-04-14 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 11 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2022-04-14 - House - House: Second Reading Adopt Finance CS (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House: Second Reading Adopt Finance CS (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-27SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI
2022-04-27SenateREFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
2022-04-27SenateL&C, FIN
2022-04-27SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2022-04-25HouseVERSION: CSHB 149(FIN) AM
2022-04-25HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2022-04-25HouseCOSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ, TARR, JOSEPHSON, SPOHNHOLZ, SNYDER, TUCK
2022-04-25HousePASSED Y21 N17 E2
2022-04-25HouseBEFORE HOUSE IN THIRD READING
2022-04-21HouseTECHNICAL SESSION 4/21 - ON 4/25 CALENDAR
2022-04-20HouseCOSPONSOR(S): RASMUSSEN
2022-04-20HouseHELD IN THIRD READING TO 4/21 CALENDAR
2022-04-20HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 149(FIN) AM
2022-04-19HouseNOT TAKEN UP 4/19 - ON 4/20 CALENDAR
2022-04-15HouseTECHNICAL SESSION 4/15 - ON 4/19 CALENDAR
2022-04-14HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/15 CALENDAR
2022-04-14HouseAM NO 3 FAILED Y10 N21 E8 A1
2022-04-14HouseAM NO 2 FAILED Y11 N20 E8 A1
2022-04-14HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED Y22 N10 E8
2022-04-14HouseFIN CS ADOPTED Y29 N3 E8
2022-04-14HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2022-04-14HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2022
2022-03-31HouseCOSPONSOR(S): STORY
2022-03-21HouseFN2: (LWF)
2022-03-21HouseNR: THOMPSON, JOHNSON, JOSEPHSON, WOOL, MERRICK
2022-03-21HouseDP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, FOSTER
2022-03-21HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NEW TITLE 3DP 5NR
2022-02-04HouseCOSPONSOR(S): HOPKINS
2021-05-12HouseFIN REPLACES STA REFERRAL
2021-04-30HouseFN1: (LWF)
2021-04-30HouseNR: SCHRAGE
2021-04-30HouseDNP: KAUFMAN, MCCARTY, NELSON
2021-04-30HouseDP: SNYDER, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ
2021-04-30HouseL&C RPT 3DP 3DNP 1NR
2021-03-24HouseL&C, STA
2021-03-24HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback