AK HB149 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-10 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/14/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to an amendment of the articles of incorporation of certain Native corporations to establish a lower quorum requirement for shareholder meetings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Native Corp. Shareholder Quorum Amends

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-10HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/14/15
2015-09-10HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 7/16 CHAPTER 40 SLA 15
2015-09-10House4:15 PM 6/25/15 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2015-04-16SenateVERSION: HB 149 AM
2015-04-16SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2015-04-16SenatePASSED Y18 N1 E1
2015-04-16SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 149 AM
2015-04-16SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2015-04-16SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2015-04-16SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2015
2015-04-13SenateFN1: ZERO(CED)
2015-04-13SenateDP: COSTELLO, GIESSEL, STEVENS
2015-04-13SenateL&C RPT 3DP
2015-04-03SenateL&C
2015-04-03SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2015-04-02HouseVERSION: HB 149 AM
2015-04-02HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2015-04-02HousePASSED Y31 N5 E4
2015-04-02HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2015-04-02HouseAM NO 3 ADOPTED UC
2015-04-02HouseAM NO 2 NOT OFFERED
2015-04-02HouseAM NO 1 NOT OFFERED
2015-04-02HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UC
2015-04-02HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 149
2015-04-01HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/2 CALENDAR
2015-04-01HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2015-04-01HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/1/2015
2015-03-30HouseFN1: ZERO(CED)
2015-03-30HouseNR: HUGHES
2015-03-30HouseDP: DRUMMOND, NAGEAK, SEATON, TILTON
2015-03-30HouseCRA RPT 4DP 1NR
2015-03-18HouseCRA
2015-03-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback