AK HB147 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/31/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/31/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Board of Public Accountancy; relating to the licensure of public accountants; and relating to the practice of public accounting.
Title
Public Accounting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/31/18 |
2018-08-03 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 8/2 CHAPTER 74 SLA 18 |
2018-07-25 | House | 3:23 PM 7/25/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-27 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2018-06-27 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 286 |
2018-06-27 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | VERSION: SSHB 147 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-04-24 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SSHB 147 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-24 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-24 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | FN1: (CED) |
2018-04-23 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, STEVENS, OLSON, MICCICHE |
2018-04-23 | Senate | FIN RPT 6DP |
2018-04-09 | Senate | FIN |
2018-04-09 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-06 | House | VERSION: SSHB 147 |
2018-04-06 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-04-06 | House | PASSED Y36 N1 E2 A1 |
2018-04-06 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME SSHB 147 |
2018-04-06 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-06 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-06 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/6/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | FIN REFERRAL WAIVED |
2018-03-12 | House | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C |
2018-03-12 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2018-03-12 | House | DP: STUTES, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, BIRCH, KITO |
2018-03-12 | House | L&C RPT 5DP |
2018-02-02 | House | L&C |
2018-02-02 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-02-02 | House | SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED |
2017-03-01 | House | L&C |
2017-03-01 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |