AK HB146 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to disclosure of information regarding employee compensation by employers, employees, and applicants for employment; establishing the fund for protection of compensation disclosure rights; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disclosure Of Wage Information

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
2021-04-30HouseREFERRED TO FINANCE
2021-04-30HouseFN1: (LWF)
2021-04-30HouseAM: NELSON
2021-04-30HouseNR: KAUFMAN, SCHRAGE, MCCARTY
2021-04-30HouseDP: SNYDER, SPOHNHOLZ, FIELDS
2021-04-30HouseL&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 3DP 3NR 1AM
2021-04-16HouseJUD REFERRAL REMOVED
2021-03-26HouseCOSPONSOR(S): FIELDS
2021-03-24HouseL&C, JUD, FIN
2021-03-24HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback