AK HB146 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to an application for a license to operate as a dealer in motor vehicles; and requiring a dealer in motor vehicles to maintain liability and property insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Dealers: Applic.; Insurance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-26 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-26 - House - House: Third Reading Return to Second for Amendment No. 1 (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27SenateREFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
2020-03-27SenateL&C
2020-03-27SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2020-03-26HouseVERSION: CSSSHB 146(JUD)
2020-03-26HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2020-03-26HouseCOSPONSOR(S): STORY
2020-03-26HousePASSED Y30 N5 E4 A1
2020-03-26HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2020-03-26 2130
2020-03-26HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 - Y32 N2 E4 A2
2020-03-26HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 146(JUD)
2020-03-25HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
2020-03-25HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/26 CALENDAR
2020-03-25HouseJUD CS ADOPTED UC
2020-03-25HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2020-03-25HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/25/2020
2020-03-21HouseFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2020-03-21HouseNR: GILLIS
2020-03-21HouseDP: FIELDS, STUTES, STORY, HANNAN, SPOHNHOLZ
2020-03-21HouseL&C RPT CS(JUD) 5DP 1NR
2020-03-02HouseFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2020-03-02HouseDP: STUTES, DRUMMOND, KOPP, CLAMAN
2020-03-02HouseJUD RPT CS(JUD) 4DP
2019-05-06HouseJUD, L&C
2019-05-06HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-05-06HouseSPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
2019-04-24HouseJUD, L&C
2019-04-24HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback