AK HB145 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/28/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/28/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Board of Pharmacy; relating to health care services provided by pharmacists and pharmacy technicians; and relating to the practice of pharmacy.
Title
Expand Pharmacist Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-01 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/28/22 |
2022-07-01 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/30 CHAPTER 29 SLA 22 |
2022-06-17 | House | 12:10 P.M. 6/17/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-08 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2022-05-16 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 145(HSS) |
2022-05-16 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2022-05-16 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GRAY-JACKSON, COSTELLO |
2022-05-16 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- A1 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 145(HSS) |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2022-05-16 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-16 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/2022 |
2022-05-11 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(CED) |
2022-05-11 | Senate | DP: GRAY-JACKSON |
2022-05-11 | Senate | NR: COSTELLO, MICCICHE, REVAK |
2022-05-11 | Senate | L&C RPT 3NR 1DP |
2022-04-27 | Senate | L&C |
2022-04-27 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-04-26 | House | VERSION: CSHB 145(HSS) |
2022-04-26 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2022-04-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON |
2022-04-26 | House | PASSED Y33 N5 E2 |
2022-04-26 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN THIRD READING |
2022-04-26 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | FN3: ZERO(CED) |
2022-04-26 | House | NR: JOHNSON, WOOL |
2022-04-26 | House | FOSTER |
2022-04-26 | House | DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, LEBON, CARPENTER, THOMPSON, JOSEPHSON, RASMUSSEN, MERRICK, |
2022-04-26 | House | FIN RPT 9DP 2NR |
2022-04-20 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2022-04-20 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 145(HSS) |
2022-04-19 | House | COSPONSOR REMOVED: MCCARTY |
2022-04-19 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 4/19 - ON 4/20 CALENDAR |
2022-04-15 | House | TECHNICAL SESSION 4/15 - ON 4/19 CALENDAR |
2022-04-14 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/15 CALENDAR |
2022-04-14 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y13 N18 E8 A1 |
2022-04-14 | House | HSS CS ADOPTED UC |
2022-04-14 | House | FN2: (CED)(SUBMITTED BY RULES) |
2022-04-14 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-04-14 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2022 |
2021-04-26 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2021-04-26 | House | NR: KURKA |
2021-04-26 | House | DP: FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ, MCCARTY, ZULKOSKY, SNYDER |
2021-04-26 | House | HSS RPT CS(HSS) 5DP 1NR |
2021-04-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ |
2021-04-19 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2021-04-19 | House | NR: KAUFMAN |
2021-04-19 | House | DP: SCHRAGE, MCCARTY, SNYDER, NELSON, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ |
2021-04-19 | House | L&C RPT 6DP 1NR |
2021-04-16 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS, STORY |
2021-04-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE |
2021-04-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ |
2021-04-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS |
2021-03-31 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MCCARTY |
2021-03-24 | House | L&C, HSS |
2021-03-24 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Boards & Commissions
Business
Consumer Affairs
Contracts
Drugs
Health & Social Services
Immunization
Insurance
Licensing
Medical Care
Occupations & Professions
Pharmacists
Regulations
Business
Consumer Affairs
Contracts
Drugs
Health & Social Services
Immunization
Insurance
Licensing
Medical Care
Occupations & Professions
Pharmacists
Regulations