AK HB143 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-12-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/7/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act naming the Daniel R. Fauske Building.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Naming The Daniel R. Fauske Building

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-10HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/7/17
2017-04-10HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 4/8 CHAPTER 2 SLA 17
2017-03-29House4:30 PM 3/29/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2017-03-29SenateVERSION: HB 143
2017-03-29SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2017-03-29SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2017-03-29SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): STEVENS
2017-03-29SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 143
2017-03-29SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-03-29SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-03-29SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/2017
2017-03-29SenateFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2017-03-29SenateDP: MEYER, MACKINNON, MICCICHE, KELLY, GARDNER
2017-03-29SenateRLS RPT 5DP
2017-03-29SenateRLS RPT RECD AWAIT TRANSMITTAL NXT
2017-03-27SenateRLS WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23
2017-03-27SenateVON IMHOF, COSTELLO, BISHOP, KELLY
2017-03-27SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): MEYER, COGHILL, HUGHES, MICCICHE, MACKINNON, HOFFMAN, GIESSEL,
2017-03-27SenateRLS
2017-03-27SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-03-27HouseVERSION: HB 143
2017-03-27HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-03-27HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, GARA, TARR
2017-03-27HousePASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y38 E2
2017-03-27HouseRECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
2017-03-27HouseMILLETT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2017-03-27HousePASSED Y38 E2
2017-03-27HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 143
2017-03-27HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-03-27HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-03-27HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/27/2017
2017-03-24HouseFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2017-03-24HouseNR: WOOL
2017-03-24HouseDP: JOHNSON, KNOPP, BIRCH, KREISS-TOMKINS
2017-03-24HouseSTA RPT 4DP 1NR
2017-03-15HouseGUTTENBERG, KAWASAKI, JOSEPHSON, TUCK, PARISH
2017-03-15HouseBIRCH, FOSTER, KOPP, LEDOUX, CLAMAN, STUTES, RAUSCHER, EASTMAN, KITO,
2017-03-15HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TILTON, TALERICO, WESTLAKE, SADDLER, PRUITT, THOMPSON, JOHNSTON,
2017-03-01HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, GRENN
2017-02-24HouseSTA
2017-02-24HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback