AK HB142 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-15 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-15 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to unemployment insurance benefits; increasing the maximum weekly unemployment insurance benefit rate; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Unemployment Insurance Benefits
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Tuck [D] | Rep. Geran Tarr [D] | Rep. David Guttenberg [D] | Sen. Scott Kawasaki [D] |
Rep. Leslie Gara [D] | Rep. Harriet Drummond [D] | Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] | Rep. Ivy Spohnholz [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2018-04-15 | Senate | FN4: INDETERMINATE(GOV/VARIOUS DEPTS) |
2018-04-15 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(LWF) |
2018-04-15 | Senate | AM: GARDNER |
2018-04-15 | Senate | DP: MEYER |
2018-04-15 | Senate | NR: COSTELLO, STEVENS, MICCICHE |
2018-04-15 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR FORTHCOMING |
2018-04-15 | Senate | L&C RPT SCS 1DP 3NR 1AM NEW TITLE |
2018-03-16 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2018-03-16 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-03-14 | House | VERSION: CSHB 142(FIN) |
2018-03-14 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-03-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG, KAWASAKI, GARA, DRUMMOND, JOSEPHSON, SPOHNHOLZ |
2018-03-14 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y32 N6 E2 |
2018-03-14 | House | PASSED Y22 N16 E2 |
2018-03-14 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 142(FIN) |
2018-03-12 | House | HELD TO 3/14 CALENDAR |
2018-03-12 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2018-03-09 | House | HELD TO 3/12 CALENDAR |
2018-03-07 | House | HELD TO 3/9 CALENDAR |
2018-03-05 | House | HELD TO 3/7 CALENDAR |
2018-03-05 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/5/2018 |
2018-02-19 | House | RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE |
2018-02-16 | House | HELD TO 2/19 CALENDAR |
2018-02-14 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/16 CALENDAR |
2018-02-14 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-02-14 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-02-14 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/14/2018 |
2018-02-09 | House | FN3: INDETERMINATE(GOV/VARIOUS DEPTS) |
2018-02-09 | House | FN2: ZERO(LWF) |
2018-02-09 | House | NR: WILSON, THOMPSON, GRENN, TILTON |
2018-02-09 | House | DP: GARA, KAWASAKI, GUTTENBERG, SEATON, FOSTER |
2018-02-09 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 5DP 4NR |
2018-02-07 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TARR |
2017-04-13 | House | FN1: ZERO(LWF) |
2017-04-13 | House | NR: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, WOOL, BIRCH, KNOPP |
2017-04-13 | House | DP: STUTES, JOSEPHSON, KITO |
2017-04-13 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) 3DP 4NR |
2017-02-24 | House | L&C, FIN |
2017-02-24 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |