AK HB141 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to allocations of funding for the Alaska Workforce Investment Board; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ak Workforce Investment Board;funds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - House - House: Concur (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 as amended (Y: 2 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-09 - House - House: Second Reading Return to Finance Committee (Y: 17 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-06HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
2017-10-06HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 8/29 CHAPTER 24 SLA 17
2017-10-06House11:00 AM 8/22/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2017-05-10HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
2017-05-10HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-05-10HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 E1
2017-05-10HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
2017-04-19HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2017-04-17SenateVERSION: SCS HB 141(FIN)
2017-04-17SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2017-04-17SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-04-17SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2017-04-17SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, BISHOP, STEVENS, OLSON, KELLY
2017-04-17SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 141(FIN)
2017-04-17SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-04-17SenateFIN SCS ADOPTED UC
2017-04-17SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-17SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2017
2017-04-16SenateFN12: (UA)
2017-04-16SenateFN11: (LWF)
2017-04-17SenateFN10: (LWF) CORRECTED
2017-04-17SenateFN9: (LWF) CORRECTED
2017-04-16SenateFN8: (EED)
2017-04-16SenateDP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, HUGHES, OLSON, MICCICHE
2017-04-16SenateFIN RPT SCS 7DP SAME TITLE
2017-04-14SenateFIN WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23
2017-04-14SenateFN7: (LWF)
2017-04-14SenateFN6: (LWF)
2017-04-14SenateFN5: (LWF)
2017-04-14SenateFN4: (UA)
2017-04-14SenateFN1: (EED)
2017-04-14SenateDP: COSTELLO, HUGHES, STEVENS, MEYER, GARDNER
2017-04-14SenateL&C RPT SCS 5DP SAME TITLE
2017-04-12SenateL&C, FIN
2017-04-12SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-04-12HouseVERSION: HB 141
2017-04-12HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-04-09HouseENGROSSED
2017-04-09HouseCOSPONSOR(S): PARISH
2017-04-09HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-04-09HousePASSED Y34 N5 E1
2017-04-09HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2017-04-09HouseAM NO 3 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
2017-04-09HouseAM NO 2 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
2017-04-09HouseAM NO 1 AS AM FAILED Y2 N37 E1
2017-04-09HouseRETURN HB 141 BACK TO FINANCE - Y17 N22 E1
2017-04-09HouseAM 2 TO AM 1 ADOPTED Y22 N17 E1
2017-04-09HouseAM 1 TO AM 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
2017-04-09HouseAM NO 1 OFFERED
2017-04-09HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC
2017-04-09HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 141
2017-04-08HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
2017-04-08HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/9 CALENDAR
2017-04-08HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-08HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2017
2017-04-07HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG, DRUMMOND
2017-04-07HouseFN7: (LWF)
2017-04-07HouseFN6: (LWF)
2017-04-07HouseFN5: (LWF)
2017-04-07HouseFN4: (UA)
2017-04-07HouseFN1: (EED)
2017-04-07HouseAM: WILSON, TILTON
2017-04-07HouseNR: PRUITT
2017-04-07HouseDP: GARA, KAWASAKI, GRENN, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, SEATON, FOSTER
2017-04-07HouseFIN RPT 8DP 1NR 2AM
2017-03-13HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KITO
2017-03-13HouseFN4: (UA)
2017-03-13HouseFN3: (LWF)
2017-03-13HouseFN2: (LWF)
2017-03-13HouseFN1: (EED)
2017-03-13HouseNR: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, BIRCH
2017-03-13HouseDP: STUTES, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, KNOPP, KITO
2017-03-13HouseL&C RPT 5DP 2NR
2017-02-27HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TARR
2017-02-22HouseL&C, FIN
2017-02-22HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/30?Root=HB141
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0141A.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0141B.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0141C.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0141Z.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB141&jrn=0978&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB141&jrn=0979&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB141&jrn=0980&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB141&jrn=0982&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB141&jrn=1006&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB141&jrn=1350&hse=H

Bill Comments

feedback