AK HB14 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-22 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/17/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to assault in the first degree; relating to harassment; relating to sex offenses; relating to the definition of 'dangerous instrument'; relating to sentencing; providing for an aggravating factor at sentencing for strangulation that results in unconsciousness; relating to the duties of the prosecuting attorney; and relating to victim notifications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assault; Sex Offenses; Sent. Aggravator

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - House - House: Concur (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 18 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-04-27 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 18 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 12 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-22HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/17/19
2019-07-22HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 7/19 CHAPTER 11 SLA 19
2019-07-12House1:44 P.M. 7/11/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2019-05-09HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TILTON, RAUSCHER
2019-05-09HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y32 N1 E1 A6
2019-05-09HouseTITLE CHANGE: SCR 5
2019-05-09HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
2019-05-09HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2019-05-08SenateVERSION: SCS CSHB 14(FIN)
2019-05-08SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2019-05-08SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2019-05-08SenateVON IMHOF, SHOWER, COGHILL, BIRCH, OLSON, WILSON
2019-05-08SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES, STEDMAN, BISHOP, REINBOLD, STEVENS, COSTELLO, HOFFMAN,
2019-05-08SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 14(FIN)
2019-05-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-05-08SenateFIN SCS ADOPTED UC
2019-05-08SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-05-08SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2019
2019-05-06SenateFN12: ZERO(AJS)
2019-05-06SenateFN11: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
2019-05-06SenateFN10: (COR)
2019-05-06SenateFN9: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
2019-05-06SenateFN8: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
2019-05-06SenateDP: STEDMAN, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE, HOFFMAN, SHOWER, WILSON, BISHOP
2019-05-06SenateTITLE CHANGE: SCR 5
2019-05-06SenateFIN RPT SCS 7DP NEW TITLE
2019-04-29SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, BEGICH, WIELECHOWSKI, GRAY-JACKSON, GIESSEL
2019-04-29SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE
2019-04-29SenateFIN
2019-04-29SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-04-27HouseVERSION: CSHB 14(FIN)
2019-04-27HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2019-04-27HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, PRUITT, THOMPSON, WILSON, JOHNSTON, STORY
2019-04-27HousePASSED Y36 N1 E3
2019-04-27HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2019-04-27 737
2019-04-27HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UC
2019-04-27HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 14(FIN)
2019-04-26HouseCOSPONSOR(S): VANCE, STUTES, JOSEPHSON
2019-04-26HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/27 CALENDAR
2019-04-26 727
2019-04-26HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2019-04-26HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-04-26HouseMOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
2019-04-26HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/26/2019
2019-04-26HouseFN9: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
2019-04-26HouseFN8: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
2019-04-26HouseFN7: (COR)
2019-04-26HouseFN3: ZERO(DPS)
2019-04-26HouseFN2: ZERO(LAW)
2019-04-26HouseFN1: ZERO(DHS)
2019-04-26HouseSULLIVAN-LEONARD, ORTIZ, WILSON, FOSTER
2019-04-26HouseDP: JOHNSTON, CARPENTER, TILTON, LEBON, KNOPP, MERRICK, JOSEPHSON,
2019-04-26HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 11DP
2019-04-17HouseFIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
2019-04-17HouseFN7: (COR)
2019-04-17HouseFN5: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
2019-04-17HouseFN4: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
2019-04-17HouseFN3: ZERO(DPS)
2019-04-17HouseFN2: ZERO(LAW)
2019-04-17HouseFN1: ZERO(DHS)
2019-04-17HouseAM: EASTMAN, LEDOUX
2019-04-17HouseDP: WOOL, SHAW, KOPP, CLAMAN
2019-04-17HouseJUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 4DP 2AM
2019-03-22HouseCOSPONSOR(S): RASMUSSEN
2019-03-20HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KOPP
2019-03-08HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
2019-03-08HouseFN6: INDETERMINATE(COR)
2019-03-08HouseFN5: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
2019-03-08HouseFN4: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
2019-03-08HouseFN3: ZERO(DPS)
2019-03-08HouseFN2: ZERO(LAW)
2019-03-08HouseFN1: ZERO(DHS)
2019-03-08HouseDP: VANCE, LEDOUX, WOOL, SHAW, STORY, KREISS-TOMKINS, FIELDS
2019-03-08HouseSTA RPT CS(STA) 7DP
2019-03-04HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS
2019-02-20HouseSTA, JUD
2019-02-20HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-02-20HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/7/19

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/31?Root=HB14
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0014A.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0014B.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0014C.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0014D.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0014E.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0014Z.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB14&Page=00727#0727
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB14&Page=00737#0737
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB14&Page=00739#0739
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=S&Bill=HB14&Page=01067#1067
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB14&Page=00962#0962

Bill Comments

feedback