AK HB139 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - COSPONSOR(S): HOLMES
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - COSPONSOR(S): HOLMES
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act adding to the powers and duties of the State Commission for Human Rights; and relating to and prohibiting discrimination based on sexual orientation or gender identity or expression.
Title
Sexual Orientation Discrimination
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HOLMES |
2014-03-12 | House | COSPONSOR(S): NAGEAK |
2014-03-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GARA, KITO III |
2014-03-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ |
2014-01-27 | House | BILL REPRINTED 1/27/14 |
2014-01-27 | House | FIRST COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA |
2014-01-27 | House | PRIME SPONSOR CHANGED: JOSEPHSON REPLACED KERTTULA |
2013-04-04 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS |
2013-02-22 | House | REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS |
2013-02-22 | House | STA, JUD |
2013-02-22 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Advertising
Boards & Commissions
Business
Credit
Employment
Executive Branch
Families
Financial Institutions
Housing
Labor Unions
Leases
Loans
Municipalities
Property
Public Accommodations
Rights
Sales
School Districts
Wages
Boards & Commissions
Business
Credit
Employment
Executive Branch
Families
Financial Institutions
Housing
Labor Unions
Leases
Loans
Municipalities
Property
Public Accommodations
Rights
Sales
School Districts
Wages
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_bill.asp?session=28&bill=HB139 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/HB0139A.PDF |