AK HB138 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act establishing the month of March as Sobriety Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

March: Sobriety Awareness Month

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-07 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL
2018-03-28SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-03-28SenateFN2: ZERO(DHS)
2018-03-28SenateDP: MEYER, WILSON, GIESSEL, EGAN, COGHILL
2018-03-28SenateSTA RPT 5DP
2018-03-16SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, COSTELLO, SHOWER, VON IMHOF, GARDNER, WILSON, MEYER
2018-03-16SenateFN2: ZERO(DHS)
2018-03-16SenateDP: WILSON, BEGICH, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE
2018-03-16SenateHSS RPT 4DP
2018-03-14SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): BEGICH
2018-02-14HouseRETURNED TO SENATE
2018-02-14HouseBILL REPRINTED 2/14/18
2018-02-14HousePRIME SPONSOR: SPONHOLZ
2018-02-14HouseBILL RECEIVED IN HOUSE
2018-02-12SenateRETURNED TO HOUSE PER REQUEST
2017-04-10SenateHSS, STA
2017-04-10SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-04-07HouseVERSION: HB 138
2017-04-07HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-04-07HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GRENN, SPOHNHOLZ, TARR, PRUITT
2017-04-07HousePASSED Y39 A1
2017-04-07HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 138
2017-04-07HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-04-07HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-07HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/2017
2017-04-05HouseCOSPONSOR(S): FANSLER
2017-04-05HouseFN1: ZERO(DHS)
2017-04-05HouseDP: WESTLAKE, SADDLER, TALERICO, DRUMMOND, FANSLER
2017-04-05HouseCRA RPT 5DP
2017-03-24HouseFN1: ZERO(DHS)
2017-03-24HouseNR: EASTMAN
2017-03-24HouseDP: JOHNSTON, TARR, EDGMON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, KITO, SPOHNHOLZ
2017-03-24HouseHSS RPT 6DP 1NR
2017-02-22HouseHSS, CRA
2017-02-22HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback