AK HB138 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing the month of March as Sobriety Awareness Month.
Title
March: Sobriety Awareness Month
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-07 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL |
2018-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-03-28 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DHS) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | DP: MEYER, WILSON, GIESSEL, EGAN, COGHILL |
2018-03-28 | Senate | STA RPT 5DP |
2018-03-16 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, COSTELLO, SHOWER, VON IMHOF, GARDNER, WILSON, MEYER |
2018-03-16 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DHS) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | DP: WILSON, BEGICH, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE |
2018-03-16 | Senate | HSS RPT 4DP |
2018-03-14 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): BEGICH |
2018-02-14 | House | RETURNED TO SENATE |
2018-02-14 | House | BILL REPRINTED 2/14/18 |
2018-02-14 | House | PRIME SPONSOR: SPONHOLZ |
2018-02-14 | House | BILL RECEIVED IN HOUSE |
2018-02-12 | Senate | RETURNED TO HOUSE PER REQUEST |
2017-04-10 | Senate | HSS, STA |
2017-04-10 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-04-07 | House | VERSION: HB 138 |
2017-04-07 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-04-07 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GRENN, SPOHNHOLZ, TARR, PRUITT |
2017-04-07 | House | PASSED Y39 A1 |
2017-04-07 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 138 |
2017-04-07 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2017-04-07 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-04-07 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FANSLER |
2017-04-05 | House | FN1: ZERO(DHS) |
2017-04-05 | House | DP: WESTLAKE, SADDLER, TALERICO, DRUMMOND, FANSLER |
2017-04-05 | House | CRA RPT 5DP |
2017-03-24 | House | FN1: ZERO(DHS) |
2017-03-24 | House | NR: EASTMAN |
2017-03-24 | House | DP: JOHNSTON, TARR, EDGMON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, KITO, SPOHNHOLZ |
2017-03-24 | House | HSS RPT 6DP 1NR |
2017-02-22 | House | HSS, CRA |
2017-02-22 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |