AK HB136 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Passed on July 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/30/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to motor vehicle franchises, motor vehicle dealers, motor vehicle manufacturers, and motor vehicle distributors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Dealer Franchises

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-03HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/30/18
2018-07-03HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 7/2 CHAPTER 50 SLA 18
2018-06-27House1:00 PM 6/25/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2018-04-20HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2018-04-14SenateVERSION: CSHB 136(TRA)
2018-04-14SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-04-14SenatePASSED Y19 N- A1
2018-04-14SenateBISHOP, MICCICHE, VON IMHOF, KELLY
2018-04-14SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): MEYER, WILSON, COGHILL, EGAN, GARDNER, MACKINNON, GIESSEL
2018-04-14SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 136(TRA)
2018-04-14SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-14SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-14SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2018
2018-04-14SenateFN2: ZERO(LAW)
2018-04-14SenateDP: MEYER, WILSON, GIESSEL, COGHILL, EGAN
2018-04-14SenateSTA RPT 5DP
2018-04-12SenateSTA WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23
2018-04-11SenateSTA WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23
2018-04-10SenateSTA
2018-04-10SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-04-09HouseVERSION: CSHB 136(TRA)
2018-04-09HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-04-09HouseJOSEPHSON, WOOL
2018-04-09HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SULLIVAN-LEONARD, BIRCH, KOPP, KITO, TUCK, STUTES, KAWASAKI,
2018-04-09HousePASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y36 N3 E1
2018-04-09HouseRECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
2018-04-09HouseCLAMAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2018-04-09HousePASSED Y36 N3 E1
2018-04-09HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 136(TRA)
2018-04-09HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-09HouseTRA CS ADOPTED UC
2018-04-09HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-09HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/09/2018
2018-04-09HouseFN2: ZERO(LAW)
2018-04-09HouseDP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, STUTES, JOSEPHSON, KNOPP, KITO
2018-04-09HouseL&C RPT CS(TRA) NT 5DP
2018-04-05HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MILLETT
2018-03-30HouseFN1: ZERO(H.TRA/LAW)
2018-03-30HouseDP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, DRUMMOND, CLAMAN, KOPP, WOOL
2018-03-30HouseTRA RPT CS(TRA) NT 5DP
2017-02-20HouseTRA, L&C
2017-02-20HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback