AK HB132 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-22 - REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to technical education and registered apprenticeships.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Apprenticeship Progs; Tax Credits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Limit Debate to 2 minutes (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 13 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-22SenateREFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
2022-04-22SenateFN9: ZERO(LWF)
2022-04-22SenateFN8: ZERO(LWF)
2022-04-22SenateFN7: ZERO(EED)
2022-04-22SenateNR: STEVENS
2022-04-22SenateDP: HOLLAND, HUGHES, MICCICHE
2022-04-22SenateTITLE CHANGE FORTHCOMING
2022-04-22SenateEDC RPT SCS(EDC) 3DP 1NR NEW TITLE
2022-01-18SenateEDC, L&C, FIN
2022-01-18SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-05-19HouseVERSION: CSHB 132(FIN)
2021-05-19HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2021-05-19HousePASSED Y29 N11
2021-05-19HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 132(FIN)
2021-05-19HouseLIMIT ALL DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y23 N16 E1
2021-05-18HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/19 CALENDAR
2021-05-18HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y13 N27
2021-05-18HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2021-05-18HouseRESCIND ACTION CS EDC (ADOPTED) UC
2021-05-18HouseEDC CS ADOPTED UC
2021-05-18HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-05-18HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2021
2021-05-18HouseFN6: ZERO(LWF)
2021-05-18HouseFN5: ZERO(EED)
2021-05-18HouseFN3: INDETERMINATE(REV)
2021-05-18HouseFN2: ZERO(LWF)
2021-05-18HouseNR: JOHNSON, JOSEPHSON
2021-05-18HouseDNP: CARPENTER
2021-05-18HouseDP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, LEBON, THOMPSON, WOOL, MERRICK, FOSTER
2021-05-18HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NEW TITLE 7DP 1DNP 2NR
2021-04-28HouseFN5: ZERO(EED)
2021-04-28HouseFN3: INDETERMINATE(REV)
2021-04-28HouseFN2: ZERO(LWF)
2021-04-28HouseFN1: ZERO(LWF)
2021-04-28HouseNR: CRONK, GILLHAM, HOPKINS
2021-04-28HouseDP: ZULKOSKY, DRUMMOND, STORY
2021-04-28HouseEDC RPT CS(EDC) NEW TITLE 3DP 3NR
2021-03-25HouseFN4: (EED)
2021-03-25HouseFN3: INDETERMINATE(REV)
2021-03-25HouseFN2: ZERO(LWF)
2021-03-25HouseFN1: ZERO(LWF)
2021-03-25HouseAM: NELSON
2021-03-25HouseDP: SNYDER, SCHRAGE, MCCARTY, SPOHNHOLZ, FIELDS
2021-03-25HouseL&C RPT CS(L&C) NEW TITLE 5DP 1AM
2021-03-10HouseL&C, EDC, FIN
2021-03-10HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback