AK HB132 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/16/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to transportation network companies and transportation network company drivers; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Network Companies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 as amended (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 as amended (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 15 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/16/17
2017-06-15HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 6/15 CHAPTER 10 SLA 17
2017-06-09House5:06 PM 6/8/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2017-06-06HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S) (REVISOR OF STATUTES & ENROLLING SEC.)
2017-05-17SenateVERSION: CSHB 132(L&C)
2017-05-17SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2017-05-17SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES, MACKINNON, COSTELLO, GIESSEL, MEYER
2017-05-17SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-05-17SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2017-05-17SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 132(L&C)
2017-05-17SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-05-17SenateAM NO 3 FAILED Y5 N15
2017-05-17SenateAM NO 2 FAILED Y6 N14
2017-05-17SenateAM NO 1 FAILED Y6 N14
2017-05-17SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-05-17SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2017
2017-05-17SenateFN2: ZERO(LWF)
2017-05-17SenateFN1: ZERO(CED)
2017-05-17SenateNR: HOFFMAN, BISHOP, OLSON, MICCICHE
2017-05-17SenateDP: MACKINNON, VON IMHOF, HUGHES
2017-05-17SenateFIN RPT 3DP 4NR
2017-05-16SenateFIN
2017-05-16SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-05-15HouseVERSION: CSHB 132(L&C)
2017-05-15HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-05-15HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GRENN, PRUITT, SADDLER
2017-05-15HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-05-15HousePASSED Y35 N5
2017-05-15HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2017-05-15HouseAM NO 3 AS AM FAILED Y19 N21
2017-05-15HouseRESCIND ACTION (ADP)AM 3 AS AM UC
2017-05-15HouseRET 2ND/RESCIND ACTION AM 3 AS AM UC
2017-05-15HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2017-05-15HouseAM NO 3 AS AM ADOPTED Y21 N19
2017-05-15HouseAM 1 TO AM 3 ADOPTED UC
2017-05-15HouseAM NO 3 OFFERED
2017-05-15HouseBEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING
2017-05-15HouseAM NO 2 FAILED Y20 N20
2017-05-15HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y15 N24 A1
2017-05-15HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UC
2017-05-15HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 132(L&C)
2017-05-13HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, REINBOLD
2017-05-13HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/15 CALENDAR
2017-05-13HouseL&C CS ADOPTED UC
2017-05-13HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-05-13HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2017
2017-05-13HouseFN2: ZERO(LWF)
2017-05-13HouseFN1: ZERO(CED)
2017-05-13HouseAM: JOSEPHSON
2017-05-13HouseNR: STUTES, KITO
2017-05-13HouseDP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, BIRCH, WOOL
2017-05-13HouseL&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 3DP 2NR 1AM
2017-04-26HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KOPP
2017-04-03HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MILLETT
2017-03-29HouseCOSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER
2017-03-13HouseCOSPONSOR(S): EASTMAN
2017-03-08HouseFN2: ZERO(LWF)
2017-03-08HouseFN1: ZERO(CED)
2017-03-08HouseAM: CLAMAN, KOPP
2017-03-08HouseNR: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, NEUMAN, DRUMMOND, STUTES
2017-03-08HouseDP: WOOL
2017-03-08HouseTRA RPT CS(TRA) 1DP 4NR 2AM
2017-02-15HouseTRA, L&C
2017-02-15HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/30?Root=HB132
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0132A.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0132B.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0132C.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0132Z.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB132&jrn=1424&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB132&jrn=1427&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB132&jrn=1428&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB132&jrn=1336&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB132&jrn=1337&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB132&jrn=1339&hse=S

Bill Comments

feedback