AK HB132 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Vetoed on April 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-18 - VETOED BY GOVERNOR 4/17/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-18 - VETOED BY GOVERNOR 4/17/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the purpose, powers, and duties of the Alaska Gasline Development Corporation related to the Alaska liquefied natural gas project and an in-state natural gas pipeline; relating to the in-state natural gas pipeline fund; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Agdc Support Of Natural Gas Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate:
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 7 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 7 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Refer to the FIN committee? (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-23 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 10 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-23 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 12 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
CSHB 132(L&C) Third Reading - Final Passage(Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 7 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 7 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Refer to the FIN committee? (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-23 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 10 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-23 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 12 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-18 | House | VETOED BY GOVERNOR 4/17/15 |
2015-04-01 | House | 1:36 PM 4/1/15 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-04-01 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 132(L&C) |
2015-04-01 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2015-04-01 | Senate | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP |
2015-03-31 | Senate | OLSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2015-03-31 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y16 N4 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | PASSED Y13 N7 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2015-03-31 | Senate | AM NO 1 FAILED Y7 N13 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC |
2015-03-31 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 132(L&C) |
2015-03-30 | Senate | REFER TO THE FINANCE COMMITTEE FLD Y5 N15 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/31 CALENDAR |
2015-03-30 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-03-30 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/30/2015 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(CED) |
2015-03-30 | Senate | NR: WIELECHOWSKI |
2015-03-30 | Senate | DP: GIESSEL, COSTELLO, COGHILL, MICCICHE |
2015-03-30 | Senate | RES RPT 4DP 1NR |
2015-03-25 | Senate | RES |
2015-03-25 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2015-03-23 | House | VERSION: CSHB 132(L&C) |
2015-03-23 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2015-03-23 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER |
2015-03-23 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y27 N11 E2 |
2015-03-23 | House | PASSED Y24 N14 E2 |
2015-03-23 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2015-03-23 | House | AM NO 2 FAILED Y10 N28 E2 |
2015-03-23 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y12 N26 E2 |
2015-03-23 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UC |
2015-03-23 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 132(L&C) |
2015-03-20 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TILTON |
2015-03-20 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/23 CALENDAR |
2015-03-20 | House | L&C CS ADOPTED UC |
2015-03-20 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-03-20 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/20/2015 |
2015-03-20 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2015-03-20 | House | NR: LEDOUX, COLVER, HUGHES |
2015-03-20 | House | DNP: JOSEPHSON, KITO |
2015-03-20 | House | DP: TILTON, OLSON |
2015-03-20 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 2DP 2DNP 3NR |
2015-03-16 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2015-03-16 | House | NR: TARR, SEATON |
2015-03-16 | House | DNP: JOSEPHSON |
2015-03-16 | House | DP: JOHNSON, HERRON, HAWKER, OLSON, NAGEAK, TALERICO |
2015-03-16 | House | RES RPT CS(RES) NT 6DP 1DNP 2NR |
2015-03-06 | House | COSPONSOR(S): OLSON, NAGEAK, TALERICO |
2015-03-02 | House | RES, L&C |
2015-03-02 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |