AK HB128 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/25/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the operation of a tank vessel or oil barge as an oil terminal facility; relating to the definition of 'oil terminal facility'; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oil Terminal Facility

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - On Reconsideration Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House: Second Reading Adopt Transportation CS (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-16HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/25/23
2023-10-16HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 5/24 CHAPTER 3 SLA 23
2023-05-15House10:30 A.M. 5/15/23 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2023-05-13SenateVERSION: CSHB 128(TRA)
2023-05-13SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2023-05-13SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2023-05-13SenatePASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
2023-05-13SenateRECON SAME DAY UC
2023-05-13SenateOLSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2023-05-13SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2023-05-13SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2023-05-13SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 128(TRA)
2023-05-12SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/13 CAL
2023-05-12SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2023-05-12SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/23
2023-05-05SenateFN1: ZERO(DEC)
2023-05-05SenateDP: KAUFMAN, MYERS, TOBIN
2023-05-05SenateTRA RPT 3DP
2023-05-01SenateTRA
2023-05-01SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2023-04-28HouseVERSION: CSHB 128(TRA)
2023-04-28HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2023-04-28HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2023-04-28HousePASSED Y39 E1
2023-04-28HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 128(TRA)
2023-04-26HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/28 CALENDAR
2023-04-26HouseTRA CS ADOPTED Y38 N1 E1
2023-04-26HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2023-04-26HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/26/2023
2023-04-26HouseFN1: ZERO(DEC)
2023-04-26HouseDP: STUTES, MINA, SUMNER, C.JOHNSON, MCKAY, VANCE, MCCABE
2023-04-26HouseTRA RPT CS(TRA) NEW TITLE 7DP
2023-03-22HouseTRA
2023-03-22HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback