AK HB128 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to charitable gaming online ticket sales and activities; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Use Of Internet For Charitable Gaming

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading Return to Second for Amendments (Y: 14 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-23SenateREFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
2022-03-23SenateL&C, FIN
2022-03-23SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2022-03-21HouseVERSION: CSHB 128(FIN) AM
2022-03-21HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2022-03-21HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
2022-03-21HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y37 N2 E1
2022-03-21HousePASSED Y37 N2 E1
2022-03-21HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR AMS FAILED Y14 N25 E1
2022-03-21HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 128(FIN) AM
2022-03-18HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/21 CALENDAR
2022-03-18HouseAM NO 3 ADOPTED Y32 N4 E4
2022-03-18HouseAM NO 2 ADOPTED Y33 N3 E4
2022-03-18HouseAM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
2022-03-18HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2022-03-18HouseFN2: INDETERMINATE(REV)(SUBMITTED BY RULES)
2022-03-18HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2022-03-18HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/18/2022
2021-05-19HouseCOSPONSOR(S): STORY
2021-03-31HouseFN1: INDETERMINATE(REV)
2021-03-31HouseAM: LEBON, CARPENTER, WOOL, THOMPSON
2021-03-31HouseNR: EDGMON, JOSEPHSON, JOHNSON
2021-03-31HouseDP: ORTIZ, RASMUSSEN, MERRICK, FOSTER
2021-03-31HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NEW TITLE 4DP 3NR 4AM
2021-03-08HouseFIN
2021-03-08HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback