AK HB128 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to management of enhanced stocks of shellfish; authorizing certain nonprofit organizations to engage in shellfish enhancement projects; relating to application fees for salmon hatchery permits; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Shellfish Enhance. Projects; Hatcheries

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE
2018-04-11SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-04-11SenateFN5: ZERO(REV)
2018-04-11SenateFN4: ZERO(DFG)
2018-04-11SenateFN3: INDETERMINATE(DFG)
2018-04-11SenateDP: MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE
2018-04-11SenateFIN RPT 5DP
2018-01-31SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): STEVENS
2017-05-08SenateFIN
2017-05-08SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-05-01HouseVERSION: HB 128
2017-05-01HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-05-01HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
2017-05-01HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-05-01HousePASSED Y37 N2 A1
2017-05-01HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 128
2017-04-28HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/1 CALENDAR
2017-04-28HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-28HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/28/2017
2017-04-27HouseFN2: INDETERMINATE(DFG)
2017-04-27HouseFN1: ZERO(DFG)
2017-04-27HouseAM: KAWASAKI, WILSON
2017-04-27HouseNR: TILTON
2017-04-27HouseDP: GRENN, GUTTENBERG, THOMPSON, PRUITT, GARA, ORTIZ, SEATON, FOSTER
2017-04-27HouseFIN RPT 8DP 1NR 2AM
2017-04-05HouseFN2: INDETERMINATE(DFG)
2017-04-05HouseFN1: ZERO(DFG)
2017-04-05HouseNR: NEUMAN, KREISS-TOMKINS, CHENAULT
2017-04-05HouseDP: FANSLER, STUTES
2017-04-05HouseFSH RPT 2DP 3NR
2017-02-15HouseFSH, FIN
2017-02-15HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback