AK HB127 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - MOTION TO DISCHARGE FROM STA COMMITTEE FAILED Y4 N13 E3
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to a permanent fund dividend for an individual whose conviction has been vacated, reversed, or dismissed; and relating to the calculation of the value of the permanent fund dividend by including payment to individuals eligible for a permanent fund dividend because of a conviction that has been vacated, reversed, or dismissed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crim. Conv. Overturned: Receive Past Pfd

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Discharge from the State Affairs Committee (Y: 4 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16SenateMOTION TO DISCHARGE FROM STA COMMITTEE FAILED Y4 N13 E3
2017-05-01SenateREFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
2017-05-01SenateSTA, JUD, FIN
2017-05-01SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-04-24HouseVERSION: CSHB 127(FIN) AM
2017-04-24HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-04-24HouseCOSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND, KOPP
2017-04-24HousePASSED Y38 N1 E1
2017-04-24HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2017-04-24HouseAM NO 2 ADOPTED UC
2017-04-24HouseAM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
2017-04-24HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC
2017-04-24HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 127(FIN)
2017-04-19HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GRENN, TARR
2017-04-19HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/24 CALENDAR
2017-04-19HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2017-04-19HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-19HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/2017
2017-04-14HouseFN1: ZERO(REV)
2017-04-14HouseAM: TILTON, WILSON
2017-04-14HouseNR: THOMPSON, PRUITT
2017-04-14HouseDP: GRENN, GUTTENBERG, ORTIZ, KAWASAKI, GARA, SEATON, FOSTER
2017-04-14HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) 7DP 2NR 2AM
2017-04-07HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG
2017-04-05HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GARA
2017-03-08HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS, LEDOUX
2017-03-08HouseFN1: ZERO(REV)
2017-03-08HouseNR: KNOPP, BIRCH
2017-03-08HouseDP: JOHNSON, WOOL, LEDOUX, TUCK, KREISS-TOMKINS
2017-03-08HouseSTA RPT 5DP 2NR
2017-03-03HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TUCK
2017-02-15HouseSTA, FIN
2017-02-15HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback