AK HB126 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/10/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/10/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act extending the termination date of the Board of Public Accountancy; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Extend Board Of Public Accountancy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/10/21 |
2021-06-11 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/9 CHAPTER 8 SLA 21 |
2021-06-09 | House | 4:30 P.M. 6/7/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-19 | Senate | VERSION: HB 126 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2021-05-19 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N- A2 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 126 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-19 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-19 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | FN2: (CED) |
2021-05-19 | Senate | NR: WILSON |
2021-05-19 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, VON IMHOF |
2021-05-19 | Senate | FIN RPT 6DP 1NR |
2021-05-17 | Senate | FN1: (CED) |
2021-05-17 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, MICCICHE, GRAY-JACKSON |
2021-05-17 | Senate | L&C RPT 3DP |
2021-05-05 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2021-05-05 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-05-04 | House | VERSION: HB 126 |
2021-05-04 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2021-05-04 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y38 E2 |
2021-05-04 | House | PASSED Y37 N1 E2 |
2021-05-04 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 126 |
2021-05-04 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-04 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-04 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/4/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2021-04-21 | House | CARPENTER, MERRICK, FOSTER |
2021-04-21 | House | DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, LEBON, THOMPSON, JOHNSON, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, RASMUSSEN, |
2021-04-21 | House | FIN RPT 11DP |
2021-04-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE |
2021-04-05 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2021-04-05 | House | DP: KAUFMAN, SCHRAGE, SNYDER, SPOHNHOLZ |
2021-04-05 | House | L&C RPT 4DP |
2021-03-05 | House | L&C, FIN |
2021-03-05 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |