AK HB125 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, BEGICH
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to a veteran's designation on an identification card or a driver's license for Hmong veterans and Lao veterans; relating to special motor vehicle registration plates for recipients of the Bronze Star awarded for valor, Silver Star, Navy Cross, Distinguished Service Cross, Air Force Cross, Coast Guard Cross, and other awards reflecting valor; relating to special request specialty organization registration plates; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

License Plates; Lao/hmong Id/dr License;

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-27 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 as amended (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-03SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, BEGICH
2017-05-03SenateREFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
2017-05-03SenateSTA, FIN
2017-05-03SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-04-27HouseVERSION: HB 125 AM
2017-04-27HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-04-27HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, MILLETT, GARA, JOSEPHSON, WOOL, KOPP, GUTTENBERG
2017-04-27HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-04-27HousePASSED Y39 N1
2017-04-27HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2017-04-27HouseAM NO 2 FAILED Y1 N39
2017-04-27House...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2017-04-27HouseAM NO 1 AS AM ADOPTED Y37 N3
2017-04-27HouseAM 1 TO AM 1 ADOPTED Y32 N8
2017-04-27HouseAM NO 1 OFFERED
2017-04-27HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC
2017-04-27HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 125
2017-04-26HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SADDLER, TUCK
2017-04-26HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/27 CALENDAR
2017-04-26HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-26HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/26/2017
2017-04-26HouseFN2: ZERO(MVA)
2017-04-26HouseFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2017-04-26HouseNR: WOOL, KNOPP, BIRCH
2017-04-26HouseDP: LEDOUX, KREISS-TOMKINS
2017-04-26HouseSTA RPT 2DP 3NR
2017-04-07HouseFN2: ZERO(MVA)
2017-04-07HouseFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2017-04-07HouseNR: RAUSCHER
2017-04-07HouseDP: SPOHNHOLZ, REINBOLD, PARISH, SADDLER, TUCK
2017-04-07HouseMLV RPT 5DP 1NR
2017-04-05HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
2017-02-22HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
2017-02-15HouseMLV, STA
2017-02-15HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback