AK HB125 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-03 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/3/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-03 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/3/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the sale of products containing dextromethorphan; relating to the regulation of dextromethorphan by municipalities; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Restrictions On Sale Of Dextromethorphan
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-03 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/3/16 |
2016-06-03 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/2 CHAPTER 16 SLA 16 |
2016-05-17 | House | 4:09 PM 5/16/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-04-17 | Senate | VERSION: HB 125 |
2016-04-17 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2016-04-17 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-04-17 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N2 |
2016-04-17 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 125 |
2016-04-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-04-17 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-04-17 | Senate | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/17/16 |
2016-04-16 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(LAW)(UPDATED FROM RULES) |
2016-04-16 | Senate | NR: STEVENS |
2016-04-16 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, GIESSEL, MEYER |
2016-04-16 | Senate | L&C RPT 3DP 1NR |
2016-03-18 | Senate | L&C |
2016-03-18 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2016-03-16 | House | VERSION: HB 125 |
2016-03-16 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2016-03-16 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HERRON, JOSEPHSON |
2016-03-16 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-03-16 | House | PASSED Y32 N3 E3 A2 |
2016-03-16 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 125 |
2016-03-16 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-03-16 | House | FN2: ZERO(LAW)(UPDATED FROM RULES) |
2016-03-16 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-03-16 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/16/2016 |
2015-04-10 | House | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2015-04-10 | House | NR: CLAMAN, LYNN, FOSTER, GRUENBERG, KELLER, LEDOUX |
2015-04-10 | House | DP: MILLETT |
2015-04-10 | House | JUD RPT 1DP 6NR |
2015-02-25 | House | JUD |
2015-02-25 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Business
Crimes
Drugs
Employment
Licensing
Medical Care
Minors
Municipalities
Pharmacists
Regulations
Regulatory Actions
Sales
Crimes
Drugs
Employment
Licensing
Medical Care
Minors
Municipalities
Pharmacists
Regulations
Regulatory Actions
Sales