AK HB124 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to corporations, including benefit corporations, and other entities; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Benefit Corporations
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Kito [D] | Rep. Jason Grenn [I] | Rep. Leslie Gara [D] | Sen. Scott Kawasaki [D] |
Rep. Ivy Spohnholz [D] | Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] | Rep. Justin Parish [D] | Rep. Geran Tarr [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-31 | Senate | FN2: (CED) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | NR: MICCICHE, MEYER |
2018-01-31 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, GARDNER |
2018-01-31 | Senate | L&C RPT 2DP 2NR |
2018-01-18 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2018-01-18 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-05-17 | House | VERSION: CSHB 124(FIN) |
2017-05-17 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-05-17 | House | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP |
2017-05-16 | House | COSPONSOR(S): PARISH, TARR |
2017-05-16 | House | CHENAULT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2017-05-16 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-05-16 | House | PASSED Y28 N11 E1 |
2017-05-16 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 124(FIN) |
2017-05-15 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ, JOSEPHSON |
2017-05-15 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/16 CALENDAR |
2017-05-15 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2017-05-15 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-05-15 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/2017 |
2017-05-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GARA, KAWASAKI |
2017-05-10 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2017-05-10 | House | AM: KAWASAKI |
2017-05-10 | House | NR: ORTIZ, STUTES |
2017-05-10 | House | DNP: TILTON, PRUITT, WILSON |
2017-05-10 | House | DP: THOMPSON, GRENN, GARA, SEATON, FOSTER |
2017-05-10 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 5DP 3DNP 2NR 1AM |
2017-04-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GRENN |
2017-04-11 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2017-04-11 | House | NR: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, BIRCH, KNOPP |
2017-04-11 | House | DP: KITO |
2017-04-11 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) 1DP 5NR |
2017-02-15 | House | L&C, FIN |
2017-02-15 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |