AK HB123 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to disclosure of health care services and price information; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disclosure Of Health Care Costs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-07 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 13 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-04-25SenateFN3: ZERO(CED)
2018-04-25SenateFN2: ZERO(DHS)
2018-04-25SenateNR: COSTELLO, KELLY, SHOWER
2018-04-25SenateDP: COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI
2018-04-25SenateJUD RPT SCS 2DP 3NR NEW TITLE
2018-04-15SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL
2018-04-06SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE
2018-04-06SenateFN2: ZERO(DHS)
2018-04-06SenateDP: WILSON, BEGICH, VON IMHOF, GIESSEL
2018-04-06SenateTITLE CHANGE: SCR 20
2018-04-06SenateHSS RPT SCS 4DP NEW TITLE
2018-02-16SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): BEGICH
2017-04-10SenateHSS, JUD
2017-04-10SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-04-07HouseVERSION: CSHB 123(HSS)
2017-04-07HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-04-07HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
2017-04-07HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-04-07HousePASSED Y34 N6
2017-04-07HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2017-04-07HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y13 N27
2017-04-07HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC
2017-04-07HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 123(HSS)
2017-04-05HouseCOSPONSOR(S): WOOL, GRENN, BIRCH
2017-04-05HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/7 CALENDAR
2017-04-05HouseHSS CS ADOPTED UC
2017-04-05HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-05HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/5/2017
2017-03-31HouseFN1: ZERO(DHS)
2017-03-31HouseAM: KOPP, KREISS-TOMKINS, FANSLER, REINBOLD
2017-03-31HouseNR: EASTMAN
2017-03-31HouseDP: CLAMAN
2017-03-31HouseJUD RPT CS(HSS) 1DP 1NR 4AM
2017-03-22HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
2017-03-10HouseFN1: ZERO(DHS)
2017-03-10HouseNR: KITO, EASTMAN
2017-03-10HouseDP: JOHNSTON, TARR, EDGMON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, SPOHNHOLZ
2017-03-10HouseHSS RPT CS(HSS) 5DP 2NR
2017-02-15HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GARA, TARR
2017-02-13HouseHSS, JUD
2017-02-13HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback