AK HB123 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/21/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/21/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the membership and voting privileges of members of the Statewide Suicide Prevention Council; extending the termination date of the Statewide Suicide Prevention Council; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Suicide Prevention Council
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Dahlstrom [R] | Sen. Anna Fairclough MacKinnon [R] | Sen. Alberta Gardner [D] | Sen. Scott Kawasaki [D] |
Rep. Beth Kerttula [D] | Rep. Robert Lynn [R] | Rep. Chris Tuck [D] | Rep. Peggy Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-05 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/21/09 | |
2009-08-05 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/20 CHAPTER 43 SLA 09 | |
2009-08-05 | 2:10 PM 6/12/09 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2009-04-19 | VERSION: CSHB 123(FIN) AM | |
2009-04-19 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2009-04-19 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2009-04-19 | PASSED Y18 N- A1 V1 | |
2009-04-19 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): DYSON, WAGONER, MCGUIRE | |
2009-04-19 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 123(FIN) AM | |
2009-04-19 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-19 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-04-19 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/2009 | |
2009-04-17 | FN2: (DHS) | |
2009-04-17 | FN1: (DHS) | |
2009-04-17 | NR: OLSON | |
2009-04-17 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, ELLIS | |
2009-04-17 | FIN RPT 5DP 1NR | |
2009-04-13 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): THERRIAULT, DAVIS, ELLIS, MEYER, PASKVAN, MENARD, THOMAS | |
2009-04-13 | FIN | |
2009-04-13 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-04-11 | VERSION: CSHB 123(FIN) AM | |
2009-04-11 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2009-04-11 | COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM, GARDNER, TUCK, KAWASAKI | |
2009-04-11 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2009-04-11 | PASSED Y38 E2 | |
2009-04-11 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 123(FIN) AM | |
2009-04-11 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-11 | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-11 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-11 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-04-11 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2009 | |
2009-04-10 | FN2: (DHS) | |
2009-04-10 | FN1: (DHS) | |
2009-04-10 | AM: THOMAS | |
2009-04-10 | NR: GARA, HAWKER | |
2009-04-10 | DP: R.FOSTER, CRAWFORD, AUSTERMAN, JOULE, SALMON, FAIRCLOUGH, STOLTZE | |
2009-04-10 | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 7DP 2NR 1AM | |
2009-03-27 | FN2: (DHS) | |
2009-03-27 | FN1: (DHS) | |
2009-03-27 | NR: JOHNSON | |
2009-03-27 | DP: SEATON, GRUENBERG, P.WILSON, LYNN | |
2009-03-27 | STA RPT CS(STA) NT 4DP 1NR | |
2009-02-13 | COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA | |
2009-02-11 | STA, FIN | |
2009-02-11 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |