AK HB121 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to certain commercial fishing loans and to loans for the purchase of fishing quota shares by certain community quota entities and establishing the commercial charter fisheries revolving loan fund, the mariculture revolving loan fund, and the Alaska microloan revolving loan fund and relating to those funds and loans from those funds; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Loan Funds:charters/mariculture/microloan
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-07 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER | |
2012-06-07 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/6 CHAPTER 58 SLA 12 | |
2012-05-25 | 2:49 PM 5/25/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2012-05-09 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2012-04-30 | FN18: (CC:HB284/CED) | |
2012-04-30 | FN17: (CC:HB284/CED) | |
2012-04-30 | FN16: (CC:HB284/CED) | |
2012-04-30 | FN15: (CC:HB284/CED) | |
2012-04-30 | FN14: (CED) | |
2012-04-30 | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 284 | |
2012-04-30 | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 4/26/12 | |
2012-04-15 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-04-15 | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 V1 | |
2012-04-15 | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS | |
2012-04-15 | VERSION: SCS CSHB 121(FIN) | |
2012-04-15 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED | |
2012-04-15 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-04-15 | PASSED Y19 N- A1 | |
2012-04-15 | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 121(FIN) | |
2012-04-15 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-15 | FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-15 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-04-15 | RULES TO 2ND SUP CALENDAR 4/15/12 | |
2012-04-15 | FN14: (CED) | |
2012-04-15 | FN13: (S.FIN/CED) | |
2012-04-15 | FN12: (S.FIN/CED) | |
2012-04-15 | FN11: (S.FIN/CED) | |
2012-04-15 | FN10: (CED) | |
2012-04-15 | NR: OLSON | |
2012-04-15 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, ELLIS | |
2012-04-15 | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 37 | |
2012-04-15 | FIN RPT SCS 5DP 1NR NEW TITLE | |
2011-04-13 | FIN | |
2011-04-13 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-04-12 | VERSION: CSHB 121(RLS) | |
2011-04-12 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2011-04-12 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2011-04-12 | PASSED Y38 A2 | |
2011-04-12 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 121(RLS) | |
2011-04-12 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-12 | RLS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-12 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2011-04-12 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2011 | |
2011-04-11 | RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE | |
2011-04-11 | FN9: (H.FIN/CED) | |
2011-04-11 | FN8: (CED) | |
2011-04-11 | FN7: (CED) | |
2011-04-11 | FN6: (CED) | |
2011-04-11 | DP: TUCK, GRUENBERG, OLSON, CHENAULT, GATTO, AUSTERMAN, JOHNSON | |
2011-04-11 | RLS RPT CS(RLS) 7DP | |
2011-04-05 | FN9: (H.FIN/CED) | |
2011-04-05 | FN8: (CED) | |
2011-04-05 | FN7: (CED) | |
2011-04-05 | FN6: (CED) | |
2011-04-05 | AM: GARA | |
2011-04-05 | NR: T.WILSON, HAWKER, DOOGAN | |
2011-04-05 | DP: FAIRCLOUGH, GUTTENBERG, JOULE, COSTELLO, STOLTZE, THOMAS | |
2011-04-05 | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 6DP 3NR 1AM | |
2011-03-18 | FN5: (CED) | |
2011-03-18 | FN4: (CED) | |
2011-03-18 | FN3: (CED) | |
2011-03-18 | FN2: (CED) | |
2011-03-18 | DP: GARDNER, MUNOZ, P.WILSON, HERRON, KAWASAKI, FEIGE, SEATON | |
2011-03-18 | RES RPT CS(FSH) NT 7DP | |
2011-02-25 | FN5: (CED) | |
2011-02-25 | FN4: (CED) | |
2011-02-25 | FN3: (CED) | |
2011-02-25 | FN2: (CED) | |
2011-02-25 | NR: JOHNSON | |
2011-02-25 | DP: MILLER, PRUITT, AUSTERMAN, THOMPSON | |
2011-02-25 | FSH RPT CS(FSH) NT 4DP 1NR | |
2011-01-24 | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER | |
2011-01-24 | FN1: (CED) | |
2011-01-24 | FSH, RES, FIN | |
2011-01-24 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Agriculture
Business
Debt
Economic Development
Financial Institutions
Fish & Game (fish)
Guides
Hatcheries
Intergovernmental Relations
Licensing
Loans
Permits
Sunset
Vessels
Business
Debt
Economic Development
Financial Institutions
Fish & Game (fish)
Guides
Hatcheries
Intergovernmental Relations
Licensing
Loans
Permits
Sunset
Vessels