AK HB120 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y6 N14
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to hunting, trapping, and fishing licenses for certain nonresident postsecondary students; relating to animal adoption and foster care records; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student Hunt/fish Lic;animal Adopt Record

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Recede from its Amendments to HB 120 (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-05-15 - House - House: Concur (Y: 2 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-05-15 - House - House: Effective Date Concur (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - House - House: Concur (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-15SenateFAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y6 N14
2024-05-15SenateRECEDE MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
2024-05-15HouseFAILED CONCUR (S) AM Y2 N37 A1
2024-05-15HouseRESCIND ACTION (ADOPTING) CONCUR SEN AM UC
2024-05-15HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y39 N1
2024-05-15HouseCONCURRED AM OF (S) Y21 N18 A1
2024-05-15HouseTITLE CHANGE: SCR 33
2024-05-15HouseCONCUR TAKEN UP
2024-05-15HouseCONCUR READ AND HELD
2024-05-14SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI
2024-05-14SenateVERSION: SCS HB 120(FIN) AM S
2024-05-14SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2024-05-14SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2024-05-14SenatePASSED Y20
2024-05-14SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 120(FIN) AM S
2024-05-14SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2024-05-14Senate...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2024-05-14SenateAM NO 1 ADOPTED Y11 N9
2024-05-14SenateFIN SCS ADOPTED UC
2024-05-14SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2024-05-13SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2024
2024-05-12SenateFN6: ZERO(DFG)
2024-05-12SenateFN5: ZERO(DFG)
2024-05-12SenateFN4: ZERO(DFG)
2024-05-12SenateNR: STEDMAN, HOFFMAN, MERRICK
2024-05-12SenateDP: OLSON, WILSON, BISHOP
2024-05-12SenateFIN RPT SCS 3DP 3NR SAME TITLE
2024-05-08SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN
2023-05-09SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): WILSON, BJORKMAN, DUNBAR
2023-05-09SenateFIN
2023-05-09SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2023-05-08HouseVERSION: HB 120
2023-05-08HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2023-05-08HouseCOSPONSOR(S): WRIGHT
2023-05-08HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2023-05-08HousePASSED Y36 N4
2023-05-08HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 120
2023-05-05HouseTECHNICAL SESSION 5/5 - ON 5/8 CALENDAR
2023-05-03HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/5 CALENDAR
2023-05-03HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y6 N32 E2
2023-05-03HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2023-05-03HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/2023
2023-04-17HouseFN3: ZERO(DFG)
2023-04-17HouseFN2: ZERO(DFG)
2023-04-17HouseFN1: ZERO(DFG)
2023-04-17HouseNR: MCCABE, SADDLER, RAUSCHER
2023-04-17HouseDP: ARMSTRONG, MCKAY
2023-04-17HouseRES RPT 2DP 3NR
2023-04-12HouseFIN REFERRAL REMOVED
2023-03-17HouseRES, FIN
2023-03-17HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/33?Root=HB120
Texthttps://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0120A.PDF
Texthttps://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0120B.PDF
Texthttps://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/F/HB0120-1-2-041723-DFG-N.PDF
Texthttps://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0120C.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/33?Chamber=H&Bill=HB120&Page=00931#AM1
Roll Callhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/33?Chamber=H&Bill=HB120&Page=00980#0980
Roll Callhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/33?Chamber=S&Bill=HB120&Page=02657#AM1
Roll Callhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/33?Chamber=S&Bill=HB120&Page=02660#2660
Roll Callhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/33?Chamber=H&Bill=HB120&Page=03247#3247
Roll Callhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/33?Chamber=H&Bill=HB120&Page=03263#3263
Roll Callhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/33?Chamber=S&Bill=HB120&Page=02845#2845

Bill Comments

feedback