AK HB115 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/13/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/13/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to aquatic farming and hatchery site leases; and requiring the director of the division of lands to provide the legislature with an annual report relating to aquatic farming and hatchery site leases.
Title
Aquatic Farming & Hatchery Site Leases
Sponsors
Rep. Andrea Story [D] | Rep. Jonathan Kreiss-Tomkins [D] | Rep. Sarah Vance [R] | Rep. Sara Hannan [D] |
Rep. Liz Snyder [D] | Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] | Sen. Jesse Kiehl [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-15 - House - House: Concur (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/13/21 |
2021-06-15 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/15 CHAPTER 10 SLA 21 |
2021-06-11 | House | 3:40 P.M. 6/10/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-15 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 E3 |
2021-05-15 | House | CONCUR TAKEN UP UC |
2021-05-12 | House | CONCUR READ AND HELD |
2021-05-10 | Senate | VERSION: SCS HB 115(RES) |
2021-05-10 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2021-05-10 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2021-05-10 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 115(RES) |
2021-05-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-10 | Senate | RES SCS ADOPTED UC |
2021-05-10 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-10 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2021 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DNR) |
2021-05-05 | Senate | NR: KAWASAKI |
2021-05-05 | Senate | DP: REVAK, KIEHL, STEVENS, MICCICHE |
2021-05-05 | Senate | RES RPT SCS 4DP 1NR SAME TITLE |
2021-04-07 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KIEHL |
2021-04-07 | Senate | RES |
2021-04-07 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-03-31 | House | VERSION: HB 115 AM |
2021-03-31 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2021-03-31 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON |
2021-03-31 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2021-03-31 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 115 AM |
2021-03-31 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-03-31 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2021-03-31 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-03-31 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SNYDER |
2021-03-24 | House | FN1: ZERO(DNR) |
2021-03-24 | House | NR: RAUSCHER, HOPKINS, CRONK |
2021-03-24 | House | DP: SCHRAGE, GILLHAM, HANNAN, PATKOTAK |
2021-03-24 | House | RES RPT 4DP 3NR |
2021-03-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HANNAN |
2021-03-17 | House | COSPONSOR(S): VANCE |
2021-03-10 | House | FN1: ZERO(DNR) |
2021-03-10 | House | DP: VANCE, STUTES, STORY, MCCABE, KREISS-TOMKINS, ORTIZ, TARR |
2021-03-10 | House | FSH RPT 7DP |
2021-02-24 | House | FSH, RES |
2021-02-24 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |