AK HB115 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): BEGICH, WIELECHOWSKI, KAWASAKI, GRAY-JACKSON
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to absentee voting; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Absentee Voting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 10 (Y: 15 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 10 (Y: 15 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 10 (Y: 17 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 8 (Y: 1 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 8 (Y: 1 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 7 (Y: 17 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 15 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 3 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 3 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): BEGICH, WIELECHOWSKI, KAWASAKI, GRAY-JACKSON
2020-02-14SenateREFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
2020-02-14SenateSTA
2020-02-14SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2020-02-12HouseVERSION: HB 115(EFD AM)
2020-02-12HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2020-02-12HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TARR
2020-02-12HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y38 N1 V1
2020-02-12HousePASSED Y24 N15 V1
2020-02-12HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 115(EFD AM)
2020-02-10HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ, JOSEPHSON
2020-02-10HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/12 CALENDAR
2020-02-10 1579
2020-02-10 1578
2020-02-10HouseAM 1 TO AM 10 FLD Y17 N21 E1 V1
2020-02-10 1577
2020-02-10 1576
2020-02-10 1575
2020-02-10 1574
2020-02-10 1573
2020-02-10 1573
2020-02-10 1572
2020-02-10 1571
2020-02-10 1570
2020-02-10 1570
2020-02-10HouseFN2: ZERO(GOV)(UPDATED FROM RULES)
2020-02-10HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2020-02-10HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 2/10/2020
2019-05-11HouseFN1: ZERO(GOV)
2019-05-11HouseDNP: EASTMAN
2019-05-11HouseDP: WOOL, STUTES, SHAW, CLAMAN
2019-05-11HouseJUD RPT 4DP 1DNP
2019-04-22HouseFN1: ZERO(GOV)
2019-04-22HouseNR: WOOL
2019-04-22HouseDP: STORY, FIELDS, KREISS-TOMKINS
2019-04-22HouseSTA RPT 3DP 1NR
2019-03-27HouseSTA, JUD
2019-03-27HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/31?Root=HB115
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0115A.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/F/HB0115-1-2-042219-GOV-N.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0115B.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB115&Page=01570#1570
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB115&Page=01571#1571
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB115&Page=01572#1572
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB115&Page=01574#1574
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB115&Page=01575#1575
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB115&Page=01576#1576
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB115&Page=01578#1578
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB115&Page=01579#1579
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB115&Page=01608#1608
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB115&Page=01609#1609

Bill Comments

feedback