AK HB115 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - PERMANENTLY FILED IN THE (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act bearing the short title of the 'Education Funding Act'; relating to the taxation of income of individuals, partners, shareholders in S corporations, trusts, and estates; relating to a payment against the individual income tax from the permanent fund dividend disbursement; and repealing tax credits applied against the tax on individuals under the Alaska Net Income Tax Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax; Pfd Payment/credit

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Refer to the Finance Committee (Y: 5 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 13 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 15 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 15 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 15 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 15 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-24HousePERMANENTLY FILED IN THE (H)
2017-05-24SenateVERSION: CSHB 115(FIN) AM(EFD FLD)(FLD S)
2017-05-24SenateRETURNED TO (H)
2017-05-24SenateENGROSSED
2017-05-12SenateFAILED PASSAGE 4 N15 E1
2017-05-12SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 115(FIN) AM(EFD FLD)
2017-05-11SenateREFER TO FINANCE COMMITTEE FAILED Y5 N13 E2
2017-05-11SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/12 CALENDAR
2017-05-11SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-05-10SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/2017
2017-05-10SenateFIN REFERRAL WAIVED UC
2017-05-10SenateL&C REFERRAL WAIVED UC
2017-04-17SenateL&C, FIN
2017-04-17SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-04-16HouseVERSION: CSHB 115(FIN) AM(EFD FLD)
2017-04-16HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-04-16House...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2017-04-16HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y22 N17 E1
2017-04-16HousePASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y22 N17 E1
2017-04-16HouseRECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
2017-04-15HouseMILLETT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2017-04-15HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y34 N5 E1
2017-04-15HousePASSED Y22 N17 E1
2017-04-15HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2017-04-15HouseAM NO 7 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
2017-04-15HouseBEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING
2017-04-15HouseAM NO 6 FAILED Y13 N26 E1
2017-04-15HouseAM NO 5 FAILED Y15 N24 E1
2017-04-15HouseAM NO 4 FAILED Y15 N24 E1
2017-04-15HouseAM NO 3 FAILED Y15 N24 E1
2017-04-15HouseAM NO 2 FAILED Y15 N24 E1
2017-04-15HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
2017-04-15HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UC
2017-04-15HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 115(FIN)
2017-04-14HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/15 CALENDAR
2017-04-14HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2017-04-14HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-14HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2017
2017-04-12HouseFN2: (REV)
2017-04-12HouseFN1: (ADM)
2017-04-12HouseAM: KAWASAKI
2017-04-12HouseNR: GRENN, ORTIZ
2017-04-12HouseDNP: TILTON, THOMPSON, PRUITT, WILSON
2017-04-12HouseDP: GUTTENBERG, GARA, SEATON, FOSTER
2017-04-12HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 4DP 4DNP 2NR 1AM
2017-02-10HouseFIN
2017-02-10HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/30?Root=HB115
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0115A.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0115B.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0115C.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0115D.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB115&jrn=1120&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB115&jrn=1122&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB115&jrn=1124&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB115&jrn=1125&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB115&jrn=1127&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB115&jrn=1129&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB115&jrn=1140&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB115&jrn=1141&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB115&jrn=1177&hse=S

Bill Comments

feedback