AK HB114 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-18 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-18 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to facilities constituting a school; relating to the powers and duties of the Department of Education and Early Development; relating to public schools and school districts; relating to early education programs; relating to funding for early education programs; relating to school age eligibility; relating to reports by the Department of Education and Early Development; relating to reports by school districts; relating to certification and competency of teachers; relating to screening reading deficiencies and providing reading intervention services to public school students enrolled in grades kindergarten through three; relating to textbooks and materials for reading intervention services; establishing a reading program in the Department of Education and Early Development; relating to the definition of 'parent' in education statutes; relating to a virtual education consortium; relating to the education loan program, the Alaska supplemental education loan program, and the teacher education loan program; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Education: Schools; Funding; Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - House - House: Effective Date Concur (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Concur (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - On Reconsideration Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Concur (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - On Reconsideration Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-18 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2022-07-18 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/15 CHAPTER 40 SLA 22 |
2022-06-27 | House | 11:10 A.M. 6/27/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-13 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2022-05-18 | House | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 24 |
2022-05-18 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y30 N8 A2 |
2022-05-18 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y21 N19 |
2022-05-18 | House | CONCUR TAKEN UP UC |
2022-05-18 | House | LIMIT ALL INTROS TO 3 MIN, DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y36 N4 |
2022-05-18 | House | CONCUR READ AND HELD |
2022-05-17 | Senate | VERSION: SCS HB 114(FIN) AM S |
2022-05-17 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2022-05-17 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-17 | Senate | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y19 N- E1 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2022-05-17 | Senate | AM NO 2 ADOPTED UC |
2022-05-17 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UC |
2022-05-17 | Senate | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2022-05-17 | Senate | OLSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2022-05-17 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-17 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- A1 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 114(FIN) AM S |
2022-05-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2022-05-17 | Senate | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2022-05-17 | Senate | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2022-05-17 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UC |
2022-05-17 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-17 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2022 |
2022-05-15 | Senate | FN5: (EED) |
2022-05-15 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED) |
2022-05-15 | Senate | AM: WIELECHOWSKI |
2022-05-15 | Senate | NR: STEDMAN, WILSON, VON IMHOF |
2022-05-15 | Senate | DP: BISHOP, HOFFMAN |
2022-05-15 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 24 |
2022-05-15 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS(FIN) 2DP 3NR 1AM NEW TITLE |
2022-04-27 | Senate | FIN |
2022-04-27 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-04-25 | House | VERSION: HB 114 AM |
2022-04-25 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2022-04-25 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-04-25 | House | PASSED Y35 N3 E2 |
2022-04-25 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 114 AM |
2022-04-25 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2022-04-25 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2022-04-25 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-04-25 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/25/2022 |
2022-01-31 | House | FN4: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED) |
2022-01-31 | House | FN3: ZERO(EED) |
2022-01-31 | House | NR: ZULKOSKY |
2022-01-31 | House | DP: CRONK, PRAX, DRUMMOND, STORY |
2022-01-31 | House | EDC RPT 4DP 1NR |
2021-02-24 | House | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2021-02-24 | House | FN2: ZERO(REV) |
2021-02-24 | House | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2021-02-24 | House | EDC |
2021-02-24 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |