AK HB114 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/14/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/14/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to boiler and unfired pressure vessel inspection reports and fees.
Title
Boiler/pressure Vessel Inspection Reports
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - House - House: Concur (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/14/18 |
2018-06-27 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/16 CHAPTER 11 SLA 18 |
2018-06-27 | House | 9:49 AM 5/16/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-04-17 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 N1 A1 |
2018-04-17 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP |
2018-04-15 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD |
2018-04-15 | Senate | VERSION: SCS HB 114(FIN) |
2018-04-15 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2018-04-15 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N- A2 |
2018-04-15 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 114(FIN) |
2018-04-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-15 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-15 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-15 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | FN2: (LWF) |
2018-03-21 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2018-03-21 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE |
2018-03-21 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS 6DP 1NR SAME TITLE |
2018-01-31 | Senate | FN2: (LWF) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, MICCICHE, MEYER, GARDNER |
2018-01-31 | Senate | L&C RPT 4DP |
2017-04-10 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2017-04-10 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-04-08 | House | VERSION: HB 114 |
2017-04-08 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-04-08 | House | PASSED Y35 N3 E1 A1 |
2017-04-08 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 114 |
2017-04-08 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2017-04-08 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-04-08 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2017 |
2017-04-07 | House | FN1: (LWF) |
2017-04-07 | House | NR: KAWASAKI |
2017-04-07 | House | DP: WILSON, GARA, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, GRENN, TILTON, SEATON, FOSTER |
2017-04-07 | House | FIN RPT 9DP 1NR |
2017-03-03 | House | FN1: (LWF) |
2017-03-03 | House | NR: KNOPP |
2017-03-03 | House | DP: STUTES, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, KITO |
2017-03-03 | House | L&C RPT 4DP 1NR |
2017-02-10 | House | L&C, FIN |
2017-02-10 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |