AK HB11 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on February 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-26 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/1/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on February 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-26 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/1/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act restricting the publication of certain records of criminal cases on a publicly available Internet website; and providing for an effective date.
Title
No Internet Access To Some Crim. Cases
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-01 - House - House: Effective Date Concur (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-26 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/1/16 |
2016-02-26 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 2/26 CHAPTER 1 SLA 16 |
2016-02-10 | House | 4:17 PM 2/9/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-02-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI |
2016-02-01 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-02-01 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 E4 |
2016-02-01 | House | CONSIDER CONCUR MESSAGE |
2016-01-29 | House | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS |
2016-01-29 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2016-01-29 | Senate | BILL REPRINTED 1/28/16 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | VERSION: CSSSHB 11(JUD) AM(EFD AM S) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2016-01-27 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-01-27 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N1 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | GARDNER, WIELECHOWSKI, COSTELLO, ELLIS |
2016-01-27 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MACKINNON, COGHILL, STEVENS, BISHOP, GIESSEL, EGAN, STEDMAN |
2016-01-27 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 11(JUD) AM(EFD AM S) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-01-27 | Senate | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2016-01-27 | Senate | FN13: ZERO(AJS)(UPDATED FOR 2016) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | FN12: ZERO(DPS)(UPDATED FOR 2016) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | FN11: ZERO(DHS)(UPDATED FOR 2016) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | FN10: ZERO(COR)(UPDATED FOR 2016) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | FN9: ZERO(CED)(UPDATED FOR 2016) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | FN8: ZERO(ADM)(UPDATED FOR 2016) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-01-27 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 1/27/2016 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | FN7: ZERO(DPS) |
2015-04-17 | Senate | FN6: ZERO(DHS) |
2015-04-17 | Senate | FN5: ZERO(COR) |
2015-04-17 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(CED) |
2015-04-17 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(AJS) |
2015-04-17 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(ADM) |
2015-04-17 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2015-04-17 | Senate | NR: COSTELLO |
2015-04-17 | Senate | DP: COGHILL, MICCICHE |
2015-04-17 | Senate | JUD RPT 2DP 1NR |
2015-04-15 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, DUNLEAVY |
2015-04-10 | Senate | JUD |
2015-04-10 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2015-04-09 | House | VERSION: CSSSHB 11(JUD) AM |
2015-04-09 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2015-04-09 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2015-04-09 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y32 N4 E3 A1 |
2015-04-09 | House | RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING |
2015-04-08 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX |
2015-04-08 | House | TARR NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2015-04-08 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2015-04-08 | House | PASSED Y34 N5 A1 |
2015-04-08 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 11(JUD) AM |
2015-04-08 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2015-04-08 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2015-04-08 | House | JUD CS ADOPTED UC |
2015-04-08 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-04-08 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2015 |
2015-04-02 | House | FN7: ZERO(DPS) |
2015-04-02 | House | FN6: ZERO(DHS) |
2015-04-02 | House | FN5: ZERO(COR) |
2015-04-02 | House | FN4: ZERO(CED) |
2015-04-02 | House | FN3: ZERO(AJS) |
2015-04-02 | House | FN2: ZERO(ADM) |
2015-04-02 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2015-04-02 | House | NR: CLAMAN, GRUENBERG, FOSTER |
2015-04-02 | House | DP: MILLETT, KELLER, LEDOUX |
2015-04-02 | House | JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 3DP 3NR |
2015-03-04 | House | JUD |
2015-03-04 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2015-03-04 | House | SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED |
2015-01-21 | House | HSS, JUD |
2015-01-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2015-01-21 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/15 |
Subjects
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Guardianship
Health & Social Services
Privacy
Public Records
Public Safety
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Guardianship
Health & Social Services
Privacy
Public Records
Public Safety