AK HB109 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/22/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/22/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act extending the termination date of the Board of Governors of the Alaska Bar Association; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Extend Bar Ass'n Board Of Governors
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Claman [D] | Rep. Chris Tuck [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - House - House: Concur (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/22/21 |
2021-08-16 | House | LAW W/O GOV SIGNATURE 7/20 CH 23 SLA 21 |
2021-06-28 | House | 2:00 P.M. 6/28/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-19 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-05-19 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y34 N5 E1 |
2021-05-19 | House | CONCUR TAKEN UP UC |
2021-05-19 | House | CONCUR READ AND HELD |
2021-05-18 | Senate | VERSION: SCS HB 109(JUD) AM S |
2021-05-18 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2021-05-18 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-05-18 | Senate | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y18 N2 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2021-05-18 | Senate | HUGHES NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2021-05-18 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-05-18 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N1 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 109(JUD) AM S |
2021-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-18 | Senate | AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y15 N5 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | JUD SCS ADOPTED UC |
2021-05-18 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-18 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2021 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED) |
2021-05-14 | Senate | AM: KIEHL |
2021-05-14 | Senate | NR: MYERS, HUGHES, SHOWER |
2021-05-14 | Senate | DP: HOLLAND |
2021-05-14 | Senate | JUD RPT SCS 1DP 3NR 1AM SAME TITLE |
2021-04-21 | Senate | JUD |
2021-04-21 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-04-19 | House | VERSION: HB 109 |
2021-04-19 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2021-04-19 | House | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP |
2021-04-16 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK |
2021-04-16 | House | CARPENTER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2021-04-16 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y38 E2 |
2021-04-16 | House | PASSED Y34 N4 E2 |
2021-04-16 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 109 |
2021-04-14 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/16 CALENDAR |
2021-04-14 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-04-14 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-09 | House | FIN REFERRAL REMOVED |
2021-03-25 | House | FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED) |
2021-03-25 | House | AM: KURKA |
2021-03-25 | House | NR: EASTMAN, VANCE |
2021-03-25 | House | DP: DRUMMOND, SNYDER, KREISS-TOMKINS, CLAMAN |
2021-03-25 | House | JUD RPT 4DP 2NR 1AM |
2021-02-22 | House | JUD, FIN |
2021-02-22 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |