AK HB106 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-12 - COSPONSOR(S): TUCK
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act allowing appropriations to the civil legal services fund from court filing fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil Legal Services Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-12 - House - House: Concur (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-12HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TUCK
2018-05-12HouseAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-05-12HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y40
2018-05-12HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
2018-05-12HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2018-05-12SenateVERSION: SCS HB 106(FIN)
2018-05-12SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2018-05-12SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2018-05-12SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, BISHOP, BEGICH, EGAN, OLSON, WIELECHOWSKI
2018-05-12SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 106(FIN)
2018-05-12SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-05-12SenateFIN SCS ADOPTED UC
2018-05-12SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-12SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2018
2018-05-04SenateFN5: (GOV/FUND TRANSFER)
2018-05-04SenateFN4: (CED)
2018-05-04SenateNR: OLSON
2018-05-04SenateDP: MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE
2018-05-04SenateFIN RPT SCS 5DP 1NR SAME TITLE
2018-02-14HouseRETURNED TO SENATE
2018-02-14HouseBILL REPRINTED 2/14/18
2018-02-14HousePRIME SPONSOR: CLAMAN
2018-02-14HouseBILL RECEIVED IN HOUSE
2018-02-12SenateRETURNED TO HOUSE PER REQUEST
2017-04-11SenateFN3: INDETERMINATE(GOV/FUND TRANSFERS)
2017-04-11SenateFN1: ZERO(AJS)
2017-04-11SenateAM: WIELECHOWSKI
2017-04-11SenateDP: COSTELLO
2017-04-11SenateNR: COGHILL, KELLY, MEYER
2017-04-11SenateJUD RPT SCS 1DP 3NR 1AM SAME TITLE
2017-03-27SenateJUD, FIN
2017-03-27SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-03-24HouseVERSION: HB 106
2017-03-24HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-03-24HouseCOSPONSOR(S): PARISH, TARR, JOSEPHSON
2017-03-24HousePASSED Y33 N3 E4
2017-03-24HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 106
2017-03-24HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-03-24HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-03-24HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/24/2017
2017-03-17HouseFN3: INDETERMINATE(GOV/FUND TRANSFERS)
2017-03-17HouseFN1: ZERO(AJS)
2017-03-17HouseNR: WILSON, PRUITT, THOMPSON, TILTON
2017-03-17HouseDP: KAWASAKI, ORTIZ, GUTTENBERG, GRENN, SEATON, FOSTER
2017-03-17HouseFIN RPT 6DP 4NR
2017-03-16HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG, KAWASAKI
2017-03-13HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KITO
2017-02-22HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, EDGMON
2017-02-22HouseFN2: INDETERMINATE(GOV/FUND TRANSFERS)
2017-02-22HouseFN1: ZERO(AJS)
2017-02-22HouseNR: REINBOLD
2017-02-22HouseDP: KOPP, FANSLER, CLAMAN
2017-02-22HouseJUD RPT 3DP 1NR
2017-02-15HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KOPP
2017-02-06HouseJUD, FIN
2017-02-06HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback