AK HB105 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/9/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/9/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to care of juveniles and to juvenile justice; relating to employment of juvenile probation officers by the Department of Health and Social Services; relating to the right to representation by the Public Defender Agency; relating to the duties of the commissioner of corrections; relating to the detention of minors; relating to minors subject to adult courts; relating to the placement of minors in adult correctional facilities; relating to terms used in juvenile justice; relating to mandatory reporters of child abuse or neglect; relating to sexual assault in the third degree; relating to sexual assault in the fourth degree; repealing a requirement for administrative revocation of a minor's driver's license, permit, privilege to drive, or privilege to obtain a license for consumption or possession of alcohol or drugs; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Detention Of Minors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - House - House: Concur (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - On Reconsideration Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Advance from Second to Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Adopt Judiciary Senate Committee Substitute (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 11 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - On Reconsideration Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Advance from Second to Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Adopt Judiciary Senate Committee Substitute (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 11 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/9/21 |
2021-08-16 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/8 CHAPTER 16 SLA 21 |
2021-06-17 | House | 8:30 A.M. 6/17/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-07 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2021-05-19 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-05-19 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 N2 E1 |
2021-05-19 | House | CONCUR TAKEN UP UC |
2021-05-19 | House | CONCUR READ AND HELD |
2021-05-18 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 105(JUD) |
2021-05-18 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2021-05-18 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-05-18 | Senate | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y19 N- A1 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2021-05-18 | Senate | HUGHES NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2021-05-18 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-05-18 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2021-05-18 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 105(JUD) |
2021-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING Y19 N1 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | JUD SCS ADOPTED Y19 N1 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-18 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2021 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | FN5: ZERO(DHS) |
2021-05-18 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(AJS) |
2021-05-18 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(DPS) |
2021-05-18 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(COR) |
2021-05-18 | Senate | NR: MYERS, HUGHES, SHOWER |
2021-05-18 | Senate | DP: HOLLAND, KIEHL |
2021-05-18 | Senate | JUD RPT SCS 2DP 3NR SAME TITLE |
2021-05-17 | Senate | JUD WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | JUD |
2021-05-14 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-05-13 | House | VERSION: CSHB 105(HSS) |
2021-05-13 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2021-05-13 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-05-13 | House | PASSED Y39 A1 |
2021-05-13 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2021-05-13 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y11 N28 A1 |
2021-05-13 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC |
2021-05-13 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 105(HSS) |
2021-05-12 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/13 CALENDAR |
2021-05-12 | House | HSS CS ADOPTED UC |
2021-05-12 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-12 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2021 |
2021-05-10 | House | FN4: ZERO(AJS) |
2021-05-10 | House | FN3: ZERO(DPS) |
2021-05-10 | House | FN2: ZERO(DHS) |
2021-05-10 | House | FN1: ZERO(COR) |
2021-05-10 | House | NR: FIELDS, KURKA, PRAX |
2021-05-10 | House | DP: SPOHNHOLZ, MCCARTY, ZULKOSKY, SNYDER |
2021-05-10 | House | HSS RPT CS(HSS) NEW TITLE 4DP 3NR |
2021-03-12 | House | FN4: ZERO(AJS) |
2021-03-12 | House | FN3: ZERO(DPS) |
2021-03-12 | House | FN2: ZERO(DHS) |
2021-03-12 | House | FN1: ZERO(COR) |
2021-03-12 | House | NR: EASTMAN, VANCE, KURKA |
2021-03-12 | House | DP: DRUMMOND, SNYDER, KREISS-TOMKINS, CLAMAN |
2021-03-12 | House | JUD RPT CS(JUD) 4DP 3NR |
2021-02-19 | House | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2021-02-19 | House | FN3: ZERO(DPS) |
2021-02-19 | House | FN2: ZERO(DHS) |
2021-02-19 | House | FN1: ZERO(COR) |
2021-02-19 | House | JUD, HSS |
2021-02-19 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |