AK HB103 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the practice of optometry; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Optometry & Optometrists

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 5 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 11 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 8 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-06HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
2017-10-06HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 7/26 CHAPTER 17 SLA 17
2017-07-27House9:13 AM 7/17/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2017-07-01HouseFN2: (CED)
2017-07-01HouseFN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 57
2017-07-01HouseLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/28/17
2017-05-12SenateVERSION: CSHB 103(FIN)
2017-05-12SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2017-05-12SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-05-12SenatePASSED Y16 N3 E1
2017-05-12SenateAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2017-05-12SenateAM NO 1 FAILED Y5 N14 E1
2017-05-12SenateRETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMENDMENTS UC
2017-05-12SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 103(FIN)
2017-05-11SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/12 CALENDAR
2017-05-11SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-05-11SenateRULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 5/11/17
2017-05-11SenateFN2: (CED)
2017-05-11SenateNR: HOFFMAN, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, HUGHES, MICCICHE
2017-05-11SenateDP: MACKINNON, OLSON
2017-05-11SenateFIN RPT 2DP 5NR
2017-05-04SenateFIN
2017-05-04SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-05-01HouseVERSION: CSHB 103(FIN)
2017-05-01HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-05-01HouseRECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
2017-04-28HouseREINBOLD NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2017-04-28HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-04-28HousePASSED Y31 N7 E2
2017-04-28HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2017-04-28HouseAM NO 2 FAILED Y11 N27 E2
2017-04-28HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y8 N30 E2
2017-04-28HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UC
2017-04-28HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 103(FIN)
2017-04-27HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/28 CALENDAR
2017-04-27HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2017-04-27HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-27HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/27/2017
2017-04-15HouseFN2: (CED)
2017-04-15HouseAM: GARA, WILSON, KAWASAKI, TILTON
2017-04-15HouseDP: THOMPSON, PRUITT, GUTTENBERG, GRENN, ORTIZ, SEATON, FOSTER
2017-04-15HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 7DP 4AM
2017-04-03HouseFIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C
2017-04-03HouseFN2: (CED)
2017-04-03HouseAM: JOSEPHSON
2017-04-03HouseDP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, WOOL, BIRCH, KNOPP, KITO
2017-04-03HouseL&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 5DP 1AM
2017-03-22HouseFN1: (CED)
2017-03-22HouseNR: EASTMAN
2017-03-22HouseDP: JOHNSTON, TARR, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, KITO, SPOHNHOLZ
2017-03-22HouseHSS RPT CS(HSS) NT 5DP 1NR
2017-03-13HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KITO
2017-02-03HouseHSS, L&C
2017-02-03HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback