AK HB102 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/30/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/30/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the state insurance catastrophe reserve account; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State Insur. Catastrophe Reserve Acct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - House - House: Concur (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 11 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 11 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - House - House: Third Reading Return to Second for Amendment No. 1 (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 11 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 11 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - House - House: Third Reading Return to Second for Amendment No. 1 (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/30/22 |
2022-06-30 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 22 SLA 22 |
2022-06-17 | House | 12:10 P.M. 6/17/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-18 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-18 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y40 |
2022-05-18 | House | CONCUR TAKEN UP UC |
2022-05-18 | House | LIMIT ALL INTROS TO 3 MIN, DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y36 N4 |
2022-05-18 | House | CONCUR READ AND HELD |
2022-05-17 | Senate | VERSION: SCS HB 102(FIN) |
2022-05-17 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2022-05-17 | Senate | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP |
2022-05-16 | Senate | WIELECHOWSKI NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2022-05-16 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-16 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2022-05-16 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 102(FIN) |
2022-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/16 CAL |
2022-05-15 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UC |
2022-05-15 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-15 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/2022 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | FN2: (ADM) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | NR: WILSON, OLSON |
2022-04-27 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, VON IMHOF |
2022-04-27 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS(FIN) 4DP 2NR SAME TITLE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | FIN |
2021-05-19 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-05-18 | House | VERSION: HB 102 |
2021-05-18 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2021-05-18 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-05-18 | House | PASSED Y39 A1 |
2021-05-18 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2021-05-18 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y11 N28 A1 |
2021-05-18 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 Y21 N17 A2 |
2021-05-18 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 102 |
2021-05-17 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/18 CALENDAR |
2021-05-17 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-17 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2021 |
2021-05-12 | House | FN1: (ADM) |
2021-05-12 | House | NR: JOSEPHSON, RASMUSSEN, FOSTER |
2021-05-12 | House | DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, LEBON, CARPENTER, THOMPSON, JOHNSON, WOOL, MERRICK |
2021-05-12 | House | FIN RPT 8DP 3NR |
2021-04-28 | House | FN1: (ADM) |
2021-04-28 | House | AM: EASTMAN, KAUFMAN, VANCE |
2021-04-28 | House | NR: TARR |
2021-04-28 | House | DP: CLAMAN, STORY, KREISS-TOMKINS |
2021-04-28 | House | STA RPT 3DP 1NR 3AM |
2021-02-18 | House | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2021-02-18 | House | FN1: (ADM) |
2021-02-18 | House | STA, FIN |
2021-02-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |