AK HB101 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/19/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/19/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act increasing the value of life insurance and annuity contracts that is exempt from levy to satisfy a debt.
Title
Exemptions: Life Insurance; Annuities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/19/10 | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/21 CHAPTER 97 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | 2:19 PM 6/7/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-18 | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y40 | |
2010-04-07 | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS | |
2010-04-07 | BILL REPRINTED 4/7/10 | |
2010-04-06 | VERSION: SCS CSHB 101(JUD) | |
2010-04-06 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED | |
2010-04-06 | PASSED Y19 N- E1 | |
2010-04-06 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI | |
2010-04-06 | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 101(JUD) | |
2010-04-06 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-06 | JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-06 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-06 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/6/2010 | |
2010-04-05 | FN2: ZERO(S.JUD) | |
2010-04-05 | DP: FRENCH, COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI, EGAN | |
2010-04-05 | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 18 | |
2010-04-05 | JUD RPT SCS 4DP NEW TITLE | |
2009-04-15 | FN1: ZERO(H.L&C) | |
2009-04-15 | NR: BUNDE | |
2009-04-15 | DP: PASKVAN, MEYER, THOMAS, DAVIS | |
2009-04-15 | L&C RPT 4DP 1NR | |
2009-04-06 | L&C, JUD | |
2009-04-06 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-04-03 | VERSION: CSHB 101(JUD) | |
2009-04-03 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2009-04-03 | PASSED Y36 E4 | |
2009-04-03 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 101(JUD) | |
2009-04-03 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-03 | JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-03 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-04-03 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/3/2009 | |
2009-03-23 | FN1: ZERO(H.L&C) | |
2009-03-23 | DP: LYNN, GRUENBERG, COGHILL, DAHLSTROM, GATTO, RAMRAS | |
2009-03-23 | JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 6DP | |
2009-02-20 | COSPONSOR(S): LYNN | |
2009-02-20 | FN1: ZERO(H.L&C) | |
2009-02-20 | NR: BUCH, HOLMES, OLSON | |
2009-02-20 | DP: LYNN, CHENAULT, COGHILL | |
2009-02-20 | L&C RPT 3DP 3NR | |
2009-01-30 | L&C, JUD | |
2009-01-30 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |