AK HB1005 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-13 - NOT TAKEN UP - ADJOURNED SINE DIE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-13 - NOT TAKEN UP - ADJOURNED SINE DIE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making special appropriations for the payment of permanent fund dividends; making appropriations under art. IX, sec. 17(c), Constitution of the State of Alaska, from the constitutional budget reserve fund; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Approp: Permanent Fund Dividend; Cbr
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | House | NOT TAKEN UP - ADJOURNED SINE DIE |
2019-06-13 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING RPT/REF |
2019-06-12 | House | IN FINANCE |
2019-06-12 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING RPT/REF |
2019-06-12 | House | SESSION CANCELED 6/11 - ON 6/12 CALENDAR |
2019-06-12 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING RPT/REF |
2019-06-12 | House | SESSION CANCELED 6/10 - ON 6/11 CALENDAR |
2019-06-12 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING RPT/REF |
2019-06-09 | House | IN FINANCE |
2019-06-09 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING RPT/REF |
2019-05-28 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 5/28 - ON NEXT CALENDAR |
2019-05-28 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING RPT/REF |
2019-05-22 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-22 | House | FIN |
2019-05-22 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/31?Root=HB1005 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB1005A.PDF |